Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45497
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2019
Case in other court:Oklahoma Western, 5:19-cv-00158
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:55 PM EST
Defendant
The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.
Represented By
Ryan A. Ray
Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler & Jeter
contact info
Defendant
McKesson Corp.
Represented By
Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson
contact info
Stuart D. Campbell
Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson
contact info
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
Michael W. Ridgeway
Odom Sparks & Jones
contact info
John H. Sparks
Odom Sparks & Jones
contact info
Defendant
Physicians Total Care Inc
Defendant
Russell Portenoy
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By
Joshua D. Burns
Crowe & Dunlevy
contact info
Jennifer N. Lamirand
Crowe & Dunlevy
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By
Joshua D. Burns
Crowe & Dunlevy
contact info
Jennifer N. Lamirand
Crowe & Dunlevy
contact info
Defendant
Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
D. Todd Riddles
Cheek Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By
Ashley E Quinn
Gable & Gotwals
contact info
Nicholas V. Merkley
Gable & Gotwals
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Represented By
Joshua D. Burns
Crowe & Dunlevy
contact info
Jennifer N. Lamirand
Crowe & Dunlevy
contact info
Defendant
MD William Valuck
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By
Ashley E Quinn
Gable & Gotwals
contact info
Nicholas V. Merkley
Gable & Gotwals
contact info
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
Defendant
Lynn Webster
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., also known as Walgreen Co.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Raymond E. Zschiesche
Phillips Murrah
contact info
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Represented By
Ashley E Quinn
Gable & Gotwals
contact info
Nicholas V. Merkley
Gable & Gotwals
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By
Ashley E Quinn
Gable & Gotwals
contact info
Nicholas V. Merkley
Gable & Gotwals
contact info
Defendant
Actavis plc
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Amerisourcebergen Corp.
Represented By
Susan E. Huntsman
Crowe & Dunlevy -Tulsa
contact info
D. Michael McBride, III
Crowe & Dunlevy
contact info
Defendant
Anda Inc
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Curran
Gable & Gotwals
contact info
Defendant
Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Curran
Gable & Gotwals
contact info
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By
Ryan A. Ray
Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler & Jeter
contact info
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Represented By
Ashley E Quinn
Gable & Gotwals
contact info
Nicholas V. Merkley
Gable & Gotwals
contact info
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Raymond E. Zschiesche
Phillips Murrah
contact info
Defendant
Perry Fine
Defendant
GCP Pharma LLC
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By
Michael W. Ridgeway
Odom Sparks & Jones
contact info
John H. Sparks
Odom Sparks & Jones
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Michael W. Ridgeway
Odom Sparks & Jones
contact info
John H. Sparks
Odom Sparks & Jones
contact info
Defendant
Harvey Jenkins
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Represented By
Michael W. Ridgeway
Odom Sparks & Jones
contact info
John H. Sparks
Odom Sparks & Jones
contact info
Defendant
Keysource Medical, Inc.
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Plaintiff
City of Guthrie
Represented By
Todd A. Court
Mcafee & Taft - Oklahoma City
contact info
Matthew J. Sill
Fulmer Sill Law Group
contact info
Tony G. Puckett
Mcafee & Taft
contact info
Harrison C. Lujan
Fulmer Sill Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 9:28 AM EDT
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Logan County, case number CJ-19-8 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc.(rb) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - JPML Transfer Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Service Packet,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Petition,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Summons to Purdue Pharma L.P,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Summons to Purdue Pharma Inc,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Summons to The Purdue Frederick Company,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Summons to Cephalon, Inc,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Summons to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Summons to Teva Pharmaceutials USA, Inc,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Summons to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Summons to Johnson & Johnson,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Summons to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Summons to Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Summons to Endo Health Solutions Inc,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - Summons to Allergan PLC,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - Summons to Actavis PLC,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - Summons to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 - Summons to Watson Laboratories, Inc,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 - Summons to Actavis Pharma, Inc,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21 - Summons to Watson Pharma, Inc,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22 - Summons to Actavis LLC,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23 - Summons to Mallinckrodt PLC,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24 - Summons to Mallinckrodt LLC,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25 - Summons to Insys Therapeutic, Inc,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26 - Summons to McKesson Corp,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27 - Summons to Cardinal Health, Inc,
Att: 28 Exhibit 28 - Summons to AmerisourceBergen Corp,
Att: 29 Exhibit 29 - Summons to Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc,
Att: 30 Exhibit 30 - Summons to Anda, Inc,
Att: 31 Exhibit 31 - Summons to GCP Pharma, LLC,
Att: 32 Exhibit 32 - Summons to Keysource Medical, Inc,
Att: 33 Exhibit 33 - Summons to Morris & Dickson Co, LLC,
Att: 34 Exhibit 34 - Summons to Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc,
Att: 35 Exhibit 35 - Summons to The Harvard Drug Group, LLC,
Att: 36 Exhibit 36 - Summons to Physicians Total Care, Inc,
Att: 37 Exhibit 37 - Summons to William Valuck, M.D.,
Att: 38 Exhibit 38 - Summons to Harvey Jenkins, M.D,
Att: 39 Exhibit 39 - Summons to Russell Portenoy, M.D.,
Att: 40 Exhibit 40 - Summons to Perry Fine, M.D,
Att: 41 Exhibit 41 - Summons to Lynn Webster, M.D,
Att: 42 Exhibit 42 - Denial of Allegations by William Valuck DO,
Att: 43 Exhibit 43 - EOA Ryan Ray for Cardinal Health Inc,
Att: 44 Exhibit 44 - EOA McBride and Huntsman for AmerisourceBergen Corp,
Att: 45 Exhibit 45 - Motion for Ext of Time by McKesson, Cardinal Health and AmerisourceBergen,
Att: 46 Exhibit 46 - Order granting mtn for ext of time,
Att: 47 Exhibit 47 - EOA Campbell and Davis-Maddy for McKesson,
Att: 48 Exhibit 48 - EOA Sparks and Ridgeway for Johnson & Johnson, Janssen defendants,
Att: 49 Exhibit 49 - Motion for Ext of Time by Manufacturer Defendants,
Att: 50 Exhibit 50 - EOA Riddles for Quest Pharmaceuticals,
Att: 51 Exhibit 51 - Motion for ext of time by Quest Pharmaceuticals,
Att: 52 Exhibit 52 - Motion for Ext of Time by Anda,
Att: 53 Exhibit 53 - Order granting ext of time,
Att: 54 Exhibit 54 - Order granting motion for ext of time,
Att: 55 Exhibit 55 - State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 56 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2867345. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 21, 2019
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Logan County, case number CJ-19-8 filed by McKesson Corp. (SEE DOC. NO. 19 FOR IMAGE.)(llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (McBride, D) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Corp . (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
7 7 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
8 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
9 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
10 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
11 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,, by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D) Modified on 2/25/2019 (llg). [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
12 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
13 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
14 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Kaylee P Davis-Maddy on behalf of McKesson Corp (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
15 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Quinn, Ashley) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
16 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
17 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
18 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Curran, Jeffrey) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE (other) by McKesson Corp Supplemental Notice of Removal(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Docket,
Att: 2 Exhibit Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit Summonses,
Att: 4 Exhibit Denial,
Att: 5 Exhibit Entry,
Att: 6 Exhibit Entry,
Att: 7 Exhibit Motion,
Att: 8 Exhibit Order,
Att: 9 Exhibit Entry,
Att: 10 Exhibit Entry,
Att: 11 Exhibit Motion,
Att: 12 Exhibit Entry,
Att: 13 Exhibit Motion,
Att: 14 Exhibit Motion,
Att: 15 Exhibit Order,
Att: 16 Exhibit Order,
Att: 17 Exhibit Authorities
Friday, February 22, 2019
20 20 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Guthrie City of.(Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Order - Trotter v. Smith et al.,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Order - Adams v. Wyeth
21 21 MOTION to Expedite Briefing by Guthrie City of. (Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
22 22 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Curran, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/25/2019 (llg). [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-State Court Motion for Enlargement of Time
Monday, February 25, 2019
23 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Expedite Briefing filed by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
24 24 ORDER denying21 City of Guthrie's Motion for Expedited Briefing. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/25/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
25 25 ORDER granting11 Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/25/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
26 26 ORDER granting22 Anda Defendants' Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/25/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
27 27 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp.(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - CTO,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Wis. Stay Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Cal. Stay Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Ky. Stay Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - 6 Cty. Transfer Order,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Cherokee Nation Transfer Order,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Delaware OK Stay Order,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Pawnee OK Stay Order,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Osage OK Stay Order,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Portland ME Stay Order,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - EDVA Stay Order,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - WDVA Stay Order,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Cal. Stay Order 2,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Ill. Stay Order 1,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - Fla. Deferral Order,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - Ariz. Partial Stay Order
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
28 28 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) Modified on 2/27/2019 (llg). [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
29 29 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Curran, Jeffrey) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
30 30 ORDER granting28 McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc and AmerisourceBergen Corporation's Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/27/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
31 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Corp Amended . (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
32 32 ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sparks, John) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
33 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Ridgeway, Michael) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
34 34 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Ridgeway, Michael) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
35 35 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
36 36 ORDER granting35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. The Manufacturer Dfts shall file their answer or other responsive pldg to plf's Complaint 60 days after the later of an entry of: 1) A decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this court's ruling on any motion to remand this action to Logan County District Court, Okla. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 3/8/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
37 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
38 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by McKesson Corp.(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - CTO-82,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Interest of US,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Withdrawal of Order
39 39 RESPONSE to Motion re27 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Guthrie City of.(Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Order Regarding Remands [#130],
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Case Management Order [#232]
Monday, March 18, 2019
40 40 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of The Harvard Drug Group LLC (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
41 41 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by The Harvard Drug Group LLC . (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
42 42 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by The Harvard Drug Group LLC. (Ray, Ryan) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
43 43 ORDER granting42 Defendant, The Harvard Drug Group, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 3/18/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2019
44 44 REPLY by Plaintiff Guthrie City of re20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Guthrie City of. (Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
45 45 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua D Burns on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc (Burns, Joshua) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
46 46 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer N Lamirand on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
47 47 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Purdue Pharma LP . (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
48 48 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Purdue Pharma Inc . (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
49 49 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Purdue Frederick Company Inc . (Lamirand, Jennifer) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
50 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re27 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
51 51 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum and Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - April 4 JPML Transfer Order
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
52 52 ORDER granting51 Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Dfts are DIRECTED to file, within 7 business days, a notice, which attaches the supplemental authority referred to in their motion. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 5/1/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
53 53 NOTICE (other) by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc re37 Response in Opposition to Motion (Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Seminole Co Stay Order
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
54 54 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand by Guthrie City of. (Sill, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
55 55 RESPONSE to Motion re54 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Motion to Remand (Opposition filed by all Moving Defendants) filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-List of Cases
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
56 56 SUPPLEMENT Authority by Guthrie City of.(Sill, Matthew) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Memorandum and Order re remand
Thursday, May 23, 2019
NOTICE from the Court re56 Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority. Counsel for plaintiff is DIRECTED, in future filings, to comply with the court's ECF Policies & Procedures Manual, Section II.A.4.a. - "Exhibits... shall be clearly labeled with the appropriate exhibit number.... Do not use alphabetical or alpha-numeric designations for exhibits...." Failure to comply in the future may result in filings being stricken.(llg) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
57 57 TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Ohio Northern for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (ac) [Transferred from okwd on 6/18/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
58 58 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:19-cv-00158. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]