New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:19-cv-05722
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2019
Terminated:Oct 09, 2019
Last checked: Monday Dec 16, 2019 4:40 AM EST
Defendant
Mark Bright
Represented By
Brian D. Caplan
Reitler Kailas & Rosenblatt, L.L.C.
contact info
Timothy L. Warnock
Riley Warnock & Jacobson, PLC
contact info
Julie B. Wlodinguer
Reitler Kailas & Rosenblatt, L.L.C.
contact info
Keane A. Barger
Riley Warnock & Jacobson, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Chris DeStefano
Defendant
EMI Entertainment World, Inc.
810 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019
Defendant
Brett James
Defendant
NBCUniversal Media, LLC
30 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY 10112
Defendant
National Football League
345 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10065
Defendant
Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.
10585 Santa Monica Boulevard
Los Angeles, CA 90025
Defendant
Carrie-Okie Music
Defendant
Carrie Underwood
Plaintiff
Jeff Cohen
Represented By
Sam Peter Israel
Sam P. Israel, P.C.
contact info
Timothy L. Foster
Sam P. Israel, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Niclas Lundin
Represented By
Sam Peter Israel
Sam P. Israel, P.C.
contact info
Timothy L. Foster
Sam P. Israel, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Heidi Merrill
Represented By
Sam Peter Israel
Sam P. Israel, P.C.
contact info
Timothy L. Foster
Sam P. Israel, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alex Wong
Represented By
Sam Peter Israel
Sam P. Israel, P.C.
contact info
Timothy L. Foster
Sam P. Israel, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Chris Defstefano
Terminated: 07/08/2019

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
58 58 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Wed 10/09 10:42 AM
ORDER: The Court having been advised that Plaintiffs will shortly file a notice of voluntary dismissal on consent, it is ORDERED, that the above-entitled action be and hereby is discontinued, without costs to either party, subject to reopening within thirty (30) days of the date hereof. Any application to reopen must be filed within thirty (30) days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/8/2019) (kv)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2019
57 57 misc Letter Fri 10/04 9:02 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Sam P. Israel dated October 4, 2019 re: in Response to Defendants' Letters Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Jeff Cohen, Niclas Lundin, Heidi Merrill, Alex Wong.(Israel, Sam)
Related: [-]