Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-20497

Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:James R Ahler
Case #: 2:19-ap-02034
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Laura Lynn Frizzo
827 S. Wisconsin Street
Hobart, IN 46342
Represented By
Laura Lynn Frizzo
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Iron River and David Thayer
One Woodward Avenue Suite 2400
Detroit, MI 48226
Represented By
Carina M Kraatz
Kitch Drutchas Wagner Valitutti & Sherbrook
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Friday, July 08, 2022
49 49 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Sat 07/09 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/08/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 48 Order
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
48 48 1 pgs order Order Wed 07/06 3:28 PM
Agreed Stipulation For Dismissal Related [+]. (mkp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer,47 Stipulation filed by Defendant Laura Lynn Frizzo, Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
court Hearing Not Held Wed 07/06 4:17 PM
Hearing Not Held Related [+]. (kdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
Thursday, June 16, 2022
47 47 misc Stipulation Thu 06/16 3:34 PM
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Filed by Defendant Laura Lynn Frizzo Related [+] (Whitten, Dan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by City of Iron River and David Thayer
Sunday, May 01, 2022
46 46 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Mon 05/02 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 05/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 44 Docket Entry (Hrg)
Friday, April 29, 2022
45 45 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Sat 04/30 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/29/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 43 Order Appointing Mediator
44 44 court Docket Entry (Hrg)(AP) Fri 04/29 12:20 PM
Docket Entry: Hearing held 4/27/22 Related [+]. APPEARANCES: Attorney Whitten on behalf of Defendant, Attorney Kraatz on behalf of Plaintiff and Attorney Godshalk on behalf of Trustee. The parties report on the change of circumstances in the Michigan appellate litigation. The parties further agree to mediate the outstanding issues now before this court by no later than June 1, 2022. By agreement, this matter is set for further Telephonic July 20, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. (kdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
43 43 order Appointing Mediator Wed 04/27 3:16 PM
Notice of Reappointment of Mediator. Documents due by 5/4/2022. (laf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
42 42 court Docket Entry (Hrg)(AP) Wed 02/09 10:38 AM
Docket Entry: The Telephonic Conference scheduled for April 20, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. has been rescheduled for Telephonic on April 27, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. Related [+]. (kdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
41 41 court Docket Entry (Hrg)(AP) Wed 10/20 11:31 AM
Docket Entry: Hearing held 10/20/21 Related [+]. APPEARANCES: Attorney Kraatz on behalf of Plaintiff and Attorney Whitten on behalf of Defendant. Trustee Chael appears. By agreement of the parties this matter is continued to April 20, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. (kdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
Monday, April 26, 2021
40 40 court Docket Entry (Hrg)(AP) Mon 04/26 9:47 AM
Docket Entry: Telephonic held 4/21/21 Related [+]. APPEARANCES: Attorney Kraatz on behalf of Plaintiff and Attorney Whitten on behalf of Defendant. The parties request additional time to complete the appellate process in the State of Michigan. By agreement, this matter is reset to October 20, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. (kdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
Friday, April 23, 2021
39 39 notice Notice of Appearance(AP) Fri 04/23 9:28 AM
Appearance by Dan L. Whitten Filed by Defendant Laura Lynn Frizzo (Whitten, Dan) Modified on 4/23/2021 (laf)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
38 38 court Docket Entry (Hrg)(AP) Mon 10/05 1:15 PM
Docket : Hearing held 9/30/20 Related [+]. APPEARANCES: Attorney Kraatz on behalf of Plaintiff and Attorney Schmidt on behalf of Defendant. The parties request continuance of the Final Pretrial Order and Final hearing because of appeal pending before the Michigan Court of Appeals. GRANTED. By agreement, this matter is set for further Telephonic Status on April 21, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. SO ORDERED.(kdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
Monday, September 21, 2020
37 37 court Docket Entry (Hrg)(BK) Mon 09/21 1:56 PM
Docket Entry: The Telephonic Status scheduled from September 29, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. has been rescheduled to September 30, 2020 at 9:30 a.m Related [+]. (kdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by City of Iron River and David Thayer
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
36 36 misc Exhibit and Witness List(AP) - Court Tue 08/25 4:36 PM
Creditors/Plaintiffs, City of Iron River and David Thayer's Expert Disclosures filed by City of Iron River and David Thayer. (Kraatz, Carina) Modified on 8/26/2020 (laf)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Exhibit and Witness List(AP) - Court Tue 08/25 3:07 PM
Defendant's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26 filed by Laura Lynn Frizzo. (Schmidt, Kevin) Modified on 8/26/2020 (laf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
34 34 misc Report(BK) Wed 08/19 1:01 PM
Trustee/Mediator Report of Mediation Filed by Mediator Paul R. Chael Related [+] (Chael, Paul)
Related: [-] 33 Order
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
33 33 2 pgs order Order Tue 08/18 2:02 PM
Joint Stipulation to Amend Discovery schedule Related [+]. (laf)
Related: [-] 32 Stipulation filed by Defendant Laura Lynn Frizzo, Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
Monday, August 17, 2020
32 32 misc Stipulation Mon 08/17 3:59 PM
Proposed Joint Stipulation to Amend Discovery Schedule Filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer, Defendant Laura Lynn Frizzo (Kraatz, Carina) Modified on 8/18/2020 (laf). Related document(s)29 Order. Modified on 8/18/2020 (laf)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
31 31 court Docket Entry (Hrg)(AP) Fri 05/29 5:54 PM
Docket Entry: Telephonic held 5/27/20 Related [+]. APPEARANCES: Attorney Schmidt on behalf of Defendant and Attorney Krantz on behalf of Plaintiff. The parties have agreed to mediate the dispute and have selected Paul Chael as mediator. The Court shall issue a Notice to the potential mediator. The foregoing is hereby reset for Telephonic Status September 29, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. SO ORDERED.(kdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
Thursday, May 28, 2020
30 30 order Appointing Mediator Thu 05/28 3:37 PM
Notice of Appointment of Mediator. Documents due by 6/4/2020. (laf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
29 29 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/30 12:58 PM
Joint Stipulation to Amend Discovery Schedule Related [+]. (laf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
Friday, March 27, 2020
28 28 misc Report(AP) Fri 03/27 2:34 PM
Proposed Joint Stipulation to Amend Discovery Schedule Filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer and defendant Laura Frizzo to extend discovery schedule Related [+]. (Kraatz, Carina) Modified on 3/30/2020 (laf). Modified on 3/30/2020 (laf). Modified on 3/30/2020 (laf)
Related: [-] 27 Docket Entry (Hrg)
Monday, March 23, 2020
27 27 court Docket Entry (Hrg)(AP) Mon 03/23 7:25 PM
Docket Entry: Telephonic held 3/18/20 Related [+]. APPEARANCES: Attorney Schmidt on behalf of Defendant and Attorney Krantz on behalf of Plaintiff. The parties agree to continue the existing discovery and trial dates. The parties agree to submit revised discovery schedules by March 27, 2020. By agreement a further telephonic prehearing on the complaint is reset to May 27, 2020 at 9:30 a.m.. SO ORDERED. (kdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
Friday, February 21, 2020
26 26 misc Interrogatories Fri 02/21 4:00 PM
First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents Filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer (Kraatz, Carina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
25 25 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 1:38 PM
Agreed Joint Report Regarding Mediation Related [+]. (laf)
Related: [-] 24 Report filed by Defendant Laura Lynn Frizzo, Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
Monday, February 03, 2020
24 24 misc Report Mon 02/03 3:31 PM
Joint Report Regarding Mediation Filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer, Defendant Laura Lynn Frizzo (Schmidt, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2020
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/06 6:11 PM
Certificate of Service Defendants Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26 Filed by Defendant Laura Lynn Frizzo Related [+] (Schmidt, Kevin)
Related: [-] 21 Discovery Plan filed by Laura Lynn Frizzo, City of Iron River and David Thayer
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/06 1:32 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures Filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer (Kraatz, Carina)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2019
21 21 misc Discovery Plan Mon 12/16 3:23 PM
Joint Proposed Discovery Schedule Filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer and Debtor Laura Frizz Related [+] (Kraatz, Carina) Modified on 12/17/2019 (laf). Modified on 12/17/2019 (laf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by City of Iron River and David Thayer
Thursday, December 12, 2019
20 20 court Docket Entry (Hrg) Thu 12/12 9:59 PM
Docket Entry: Telephonic held 12/4/19 Related [+]. APPEARANCES: Attorney Hoham on behalf of Trustee, Attorney Schmidt on behalf of Defendant and Attorney Kraatz on behalf of Plaintiff. Parties agree to prepare and file with the court a discovery schedule by December 18, 2019. Parties agree to reset for Telephonic Conference. The foregoing is hereby reset for Telephonic March 18, 2020 at 9:45 a.m. SO ORDERED. (kdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
Monday, November 04, 2019
19 19 court Docket Entry (Hrg) Mon 11/04 4:20 PM
Docket Entry: Hearing held 11/4/19 Related [+]. APPEARANCES: Attorney Hoham on behalf of Trustee, Attorney Schmidt on behalf of Defendant and Attorney Kraatz on behalf of Plaintiff. Parties agree to reset for Telephonic Conference. The foregoing is hereby reset for Telephonic December 4, 2019 at 10:15 a.m. SO ORDERED. (kdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
Thursday, October 10, 2019
18 18 order Set Conference Thu 10/10 1:38 PM
Order for Initial Pre-Trial Conference Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 11:00 AM at Hammond - 3rd Floor, Courtroom 8. (mjc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
Friday, September 27, 2019
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/27 12:40 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Laura Lynn Frizzo (Schmidt, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
16 16 order Extend Time Tue 09/10 8:54 AM
Order. Answer due 9/27/19. Related [+] (laf)
Related: [-] 15
court Hearing Held (Other) Tue 09/10 1:35 PM
Hearing Held 9/9/19 Related [+]. APPEARANCES: Attorney Godshalk on behalf of Trustee and Attorney Schmidt on behalf of Defendant. Motion granted. (kdr)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Extend Time filed by Defendant Laura Lynn Frizzo
Friday, September 06, 2019
15 15 motion Extend Time Fri 09/06 12:22 PM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Defendant Laura Lynn Frizzo Related [+] (Schmidt, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by City of Iron River and David Thayer
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
14 14 order Set Conference Wed 08/28 9:42 AM
Order for Status conference Related [+]. Status Conference - Tele to be held on 9/9/2019 at 11:00 AM at Hammond - 3rd Floor, Courtroom 8. (laf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer
Friday, August 23, 2019
13 13 motion Extend Time Fri 08/23 4:06 PM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Defendant Laura Lynn Frizzo Related [+] (Schmidt, Kevin)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Thu 08/15 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/14/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Monday, August 12, 2019
11 11 order Extend Time Mon 08/12 12:51 PM
Order Related [+] (laf)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, August 09, 2019
10 10 motion Extend Time Fri 08/09 12:30 PM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Defendant Laura Lynn Frizzo Related [+] (Schmidt, Kevin)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Thu 08/01 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/31/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Monday, July 29, 2019
8 8 order Extend Time Mon 07/29 1:07 PM
Order. Answer due August 9, 2019. Related [+] (laf)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, July 26, 2019
7 7 motion Extend Time Fri 07/26 11:40 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint Filed by Defendant Laura Lynn Frizzo Related [+] (Schmidt, Kevin)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/26 11:31 AM
Notice of Appearance by Kevin M. Schmidt Filed by Defendant Laura Lynn Frizzo (Schmidt, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Sat 06/29 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 06/28/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Notice
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/26 2:24 PM
Notice of Appearance by Carina M Kraatz Filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer (Kraatz, Carina)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice Wed 06/26 1:23 PM
pro hac vice letter to Atty Kraatz Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff City of Iron River and David Thayer. (dlz
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 06/26 10:08 AM
Summons Issued on Laura Lynn Frizzo Date Issued 6/26/2019, Answer Due 7/26/2019. (laf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/25 12:57 PM
Adversary case 19-02034 (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) Complaint by City of Iron River and David Thayer, Laura Lynn Frizzo against City of Iron River and David Thayer. Fee Amount $350. (Kraatz, Carina)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 06/25 3:15 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-02034 jra] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A20072937, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1