Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45560
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2019
Case in other court:Michigan Western, 1:19-cv-00438
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:00 PM EST
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
Defendant
Meijer, Inc.
Defendant
Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Plaintiff
County of Calhoun
Represented By
Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Greene Ketchum Farrell Bailey & Tweel
contact info
Lisa Michelle Esser
Sommers Schwartz
contact info
James C. Peterson
Hill, Peterson, Carper, Bee & Deitzler
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/08/2019 3:11 PM EST
Friday, June 07, 2019
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Calhoun, County of in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4455917 (Esser, Lisa) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (jlg) [Transferred from miwd on 6/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Calhoun, County of (Esser, Lisa) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (jlg) [Transferred from miwd on 6/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
2 2 1 pgs Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Carmody indicating that this case related to 1:17-cv-1114 (jlb) [Transferred from miwd on 6/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Specgx LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Kroger Co., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern, Co., Walmart Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (none provided) (clw) [Transferred from miwd on 6/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (clw) [Transferred from miwd on 6/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
4 4 COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Northern District of Ohio regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2804, In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation (clw) [Transferred from miwd on 6/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2019
CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Northern District of Ohio (clw) [Transferred from miwd on 6/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 COPY of AMENDED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Northern District of Ohio regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2804, In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation (clw) [Transferred from miwd on 6/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Northern District of Ohio; case transferred to Northern District of Ohio under MDL No. 2804, In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation (clw) [Transferred from miwd on 6/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
7 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Michigan Western. Case number 1:19-cv-00438. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]