Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:19-cv-00495
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2019
Terminated:Sep 29, 2021
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2019 4:14 AM EST
Defendant
Ryan O'Neill
Represented By
Stephanie L Nemeth
Anderson Agostino & Keller PC
contact info
Peter J Agostino
Anderson Agostino & Keller PC
contact info
Defendant
South Bend City of
Represented By
Stephanie L Nemeth
Anderson Agostino & Keller PC
contact info
Peter J Agostino
Anderson Agostino & Keller PC
contact info
Defendant
Richard McDevitt
Vouga & Associates LLC 2252 W 93rd Avenue
Merrillville, IN 46410
Estate Plaintiff
Eric Jack Logan
Represented By
Brian W Coffman
Coffman Law Offices PC
contact info
Trent A McCain
Mccain Law Offices
contact info
Interested Party
St Joseph County Prosecutor's Office
Represented By
Courtney Lyn Abshire
contact info
Robert A Rowlett
contact info
Movant
St. Joseph County Metro Homicide Unit
205 W. Jefferson Blvd Suite 502
South Bend, IN 46601
Represented By
James F Groves
Lee Groves And Zalas
contact info


1. Family Of Eric Logan Files Lawsuit Against Officer, South Bend (huffpost.com)
Submitted Thu 06/27/2019
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
appeal Appeal Record Returned Wed 10/26 5:45 PM
Appeal Record Returned: 1 envelope containing video exhibits H, I and J. Stored in the South Bend Clerk's Office. (nae)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
168 168 appeal USCA Mandate Tue 10/25 3:33 PM
Certified MANDATE of USCA as to163 Notice of Appeal filed by Eric Jack Logan: The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. and returning the district court record consisting of 1 envelope containing video exhibits H, I, and J to be returned.(jld)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified Opinion,
Att: 2 Certified Final Judgment