City of Sioux Falls v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-01806 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2019 4:40 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company LLC, The
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Sioux Falls
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
180 | 180
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 07/11 1:16 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by 3M Company.(Bulger, Richard) Per filing event cannot be re-spread correctly without deleting and refiling in its entirety (see 5282 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG), clerk has filed in this correct member case separately (with corrected exhibit as provided by attorney filing user) as of original filing date(sshe, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
179 | 179
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 07/03 11:23 AM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. as listed on Motion The Court GRANTS 5227 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al) Motion of Sundeep K. (Rob) Addy to Withdraw as Attorney for Corteva Inc, Dupont De Nemours Inc, E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/3/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |