Vermont Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert E Littlefield Jr
Case #: 2:19-bk-10285
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2019
Terminated:Nov 28, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Dec 10, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Springfield Medical Care Systems, Inc.
25 Ridgewood Rd
Springfield, VT 05156-3050
Represented By
Adam R. Prescott
Bernstein, Shur, Sawyer & Nelson, P.A.
contact info
Douglas J Wolinsky
contact info
D. Sam Anderson
Bernstein, Shur, Sawyer & Nelson, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U S Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee Leo O'Brien Federal Building 11A Clinton Ave., Room 620
Albany, NY 12207

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 12:02 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
675 675 court BNC - Final Decree Thu 12/01 12:31 AM
Certificate of Notice by Bankruptcy Noticing Center Re:674 Final Decree - Bankruptcy Case Closed. Notice Date 11/30/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
674 674 court 6-Close Bankruptcy Case w/ Fnl Decree Mon 11/28 4:15 PM
Final Decree - Bankruptcy Case Closed. (al)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/28 4:04 PM
Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-1004 Closed. (al)
Related: [-]