Jalbert v. The Coughlan Group, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11906
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11906
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01310 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Nov 22, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
The Coughlan Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig R. Jalbert, in his capacity as the Liquidation Trustee of the Liquidation Trust created pursuant to the Confirmed Revised Second Amended Joint Plan of Liquidation of the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession and the Official Committee of Unsecured Credit
Verdolino & Kiwet, P.C. 124 Washington Street
Foxboro, MA 02035 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Fri 11/22 11:15 AM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 11/22/2019 dismissing adversary proceeding with prejudice (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 11/22 11:27 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1310 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
||
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 11/19 3:16 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Stipulation and Order of Dismissal With Prejudice with Court Retaining Jurisdiction to Enforce Terms of Stipulation filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
other
Certificate, Service
Fri 10/11 4:45 PM
Certificate of Service of Answer filed by Alec P. Ostrow on behalf of The Coughlan Group, Inc.. (Ostrow, Alec) |
|
14 | 14
answer
None
Fri 10/11 4:02 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Alec P. Ostrow on behalf of The Coughlan Group, Inc.. (Ostrow, Alec) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Thu 09/19 3:34 PM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 9/19/2019 further extending time to respond to complaint to October 14, 2019. Pre-Trial Conference adjourned to November 6, 2019 at 10:00 am. (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Motion, Extend Time
Thu 09/19 11:21 AM
Motion to Extend Time of Pre-Trial Conference to November 6, 2019 filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Motion, Extend Time
Wed 09/18 3:40 PM
Motion to Extend Time Stipulation Enlarging Time to Respond to Adversary Complaint filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 08/16 4:37 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Richard Weiss on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Weiss, Richard) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 08/16 4:23 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by William Dunnegan on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Dunnegan, William) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Thu 08/15 3:31 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Alec P. Ostrow on behalf of The Coughlan Group, Inc.. (Ostrow, Alec) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Proposed Order
Tue 08/13 1:30 PM
Notice of Proposed Order Adjourning Pre-Trial Conference (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Fri 08/09 12:21 PM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 8/8/2019 Between Plaintiff and Defendant Extending Time to Respond to Complaint to 9/23/2019. (Bush, Brent) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Consent
Thu 08/08 3:04 PM
Consent Enlarge Defendant's Time to Respond to Adversary Complaint filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. Reply due by 9/23/2019, (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Affidavit of Service
Fri 08/02 10:58 AM
Affidavit of Service filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 07/10 11:33 AM
Second Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617, Answer due by 8/9/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tue 07/09 11:53 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 8/8/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Tue 07/09 4:33 PM
Request for a Amended Summons filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Mon 07/08 4:06 PM
Adversary case 19-01310 Complaint against The Coughlan Group, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |