Jalbert v. Millennium Century Contracting Corp.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11906
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11906
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01312 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Millennium Century Contracting Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig R. Jalbert, in his capacity as the Liquidation Trustee of the Liquidation Trust created pursuant to the Confirmed Revised Second Amended Joint Plan of Liquidation of the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession and the Official Committee of Unsecured Credit
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Monday, December 21, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Mon 12/21 3:49 PM
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 12/21/2020 Dismissing this Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 12/21 3:56 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1312 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Fri 12/18 10:28 PM
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law of Plaintiff Filed by William Dunnegan on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Dunnegan, William) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation
Fri 12/18 10:27 PM
Stipulation Plaintiff's Proposed Pretrial Order Filed by William Dunnegan on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert.(Dunnegan, William) |
|
Att: 1 Schedule A - Plaintiff's Exhibit List | ||
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 12/09 1:11 PM
Amended Scheduling Order signed on 12/9/2020 . Pre-trial conference to be held on 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (MEW). (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Tuesday, December 08, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Letter
Tue 12/08 1:08 PM
Letter Application for Short Extension to file Joint Pretrial Order Filed by Timothy J. Fierst on behalf of Millennium Century Contracting Corp.. (Fierst, Timothy) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 11/16 2:37 PM
Scheduling Order signed on 11/16/2020 scheduling final pre-trial conference. Final pre-trial conference to be held on 12/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (MEW). (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Thu 11/12 3:08 PM
Letter regarding trial consolidation Filed by William Dunnegan on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Dunnegan, William) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 03/30 11:09 AM
Amended Scheduling Order signed on 3/30/2020 . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Sunday, March 29, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Sun 03/29 11:34 AM
Letter Regarding Amendment of Pretriai Schedule Filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert.(Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
order
~Generic~ Order
Mon 01/13 4:10 PM
Protective Order signed on 1/13/2020 . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation
Mon 01/13 11:45 AM
Stipulation Letter Advising Court of Consent of All Parties to Proposed Protective Order Filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert.(Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. A to Proposed Protective Order | ||
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Motion, Protective Order
Thu 12/12 11:12 AM
Motion for Protective Order filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert with hearing to be held on 1/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) Responses due by 1/9/2020,. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Pleading Declaration of J. Joseph Bainton | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order | ||
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 11/20 4:24 PM
Order signed on 11/20/2019 consolidating cases for pretrial discovery only and scheduling order . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Wed 11/20 1:12 PM
Amended Notice of Proposed Order Consolidating Cases for Pretrial Discovery Only and Pretrial Order filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Proposed Order
Tue 11/12 10:20 AM
Notice of Proposed Order Consolidating Cases for Pretrial Discovery and Pretrial Order (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
answer
None
Tue 11/05 11:05 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Timothy J. Fierst on behalf of Millennium Century Contracting Corp.. (Fierst, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation
Tue 10/15 11:50 AM
Stipulation Enlarging Time Filed by Timothy J. Fierst on behalf of Millennium Century Contracting Corp.. (Fierst, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice, Substitution of Attorney
Tue 10/08 12:18 PM
Notice of Substitution of Attorney for Millennium Century Contracting Corp. from Norman Mendelson to Timothy J. Fierst filed by Timothy J. Fierst on behalf of Millennium Century Contracting Corp.. (Fierst, Timothy) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Mon 09/30 2:01 PM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 9/30/2019 extending time to respond to the complaint to October 11, 2019 . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Motion, Extend Time
Mon 09/30 10:32 AM
Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Adversary Complaint filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Motion, Extend Time
Thu 09/19 11:23 AM
Motion to Extend Time of Pre-Trial Conference to November 6, 2019 filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Wed 08/21 4:12 PM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 8/21/2019 extending time to answer to the complaint to September 27, 2019 . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Wed 08/21 8:35 AM
Notice of Presentment Stipulation and Order Enlarging Time to Respond to Adversary Complaint filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 08/16 4:40 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Richard Weiss on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Weiss, Richard) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 08/16 4:25 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by William Dunnegan on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Dunnegan, William) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tue 08/13 3:37 PM
Third Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 9/12/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Proposed Order
Tue 08/13 1:30 PM
Notice of Proposed Order Adjourning Pre-Trial Conference (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Tue 08/13 3:24 PM
Request for a Third filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
other
Certificate, Service
Tue 07/23 12:07 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 07/10 11:33 AM
Second Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617, Answer due by 8/9/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tue 07/09 11:53 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 8/8/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Tue 07/09 4:36 PM
Request for a Amended Summons filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Mon 07/08 4:26 PM
Adversary case 19-01312 Complaint against Millennium Century Contracting Corp. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |