Jalbert v. 8904 Fifth Avenue Realty, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11906
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11906
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01313 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 12, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
8904 Fifth Avenue Realty, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig R. Jalbert, in his capacity as the Liquidation Trustee of the Liquidation Trust created pursuant to the Confirmed Revised Second Amended Joint Plan of Liquidation of the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession and the Official Committee of Unsecured Credit
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 12, 2022 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 05/12 8:14 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1313 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
||
Wednesday, May 11, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Wed 05/11 1:28 PM
Notice of Dismissal without prejudice and without costs filed by William Dunnegan on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Dunnegan, William) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Affidavit of Service
Tue 09/24 10:01 AM
Affidavit of Service Fourth Summons filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 09/13 9:41 AM
FOURTH Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 10/15/2019, (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Thu 09/12 6:22 PM
Request for a Fourth Summons filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
||
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 08/16 4:41 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Richard Weiss on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Weiss, Richard) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 08/16 4:27 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by William Dunnegan on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Dunnegan, William) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tue 08/13 3:58 PM
Third Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 9/12/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Proposed Order
Tue 08/13 1:30 PM
Notice of Proposed Order Adjourning Pre-Trial Conference (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Tue 08/13 3:34 PM
Request for a Third filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Affidavit of Service
Fri 08/02 10:34 AM
Affidavit of Service filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 07/10 11:33 AM
Second Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617, Answer due by 8/9/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tue 07/09 11:53 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 8/8/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Tue 07/09 4:37 PM
Request for a Amended Summons filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Mon 07/08 4:35 PM
Adversary case 19-01313 Complaint against 8904 Fifth Avenue Realty, LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A - C |