Jalbert v. Riverside Machinery Co., Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11906
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11906
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01314 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Riverside Machinery Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig R. Jalbert, in his capacity as the Liquidation Trustee of the Liquidation Trust created pursuant to the Confirmed Revised Second Amended Joint Plan of Liquidation of the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession and the Official Committee of Unsecured Credit
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Thu 06/25 8:30 AM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 6/25/2020 dismissing adversary proceeding with prejudice. (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 06/25 8:33 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1314 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
||
Tuesday, May 05, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Tue 05/05 12:05 PM
So Ordered Stipulation and Mediation Order signed on 5/5/2020. (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Monday, May 04, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
ans
Amended Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/04 4:56 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint /Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of Riverside Machinery Co., Inc..(Tsukerman, Mark) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 04/20 3:56 PM
Amended Complaint against Craig R. Jalbert Second Amended Complaint Filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Motion, Amend
Mon 04/20 3:55 PM
Consent Motion to Amend Amended Complaint filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 03/30 11:08 AM
Amended Scheduling Order signed on 3/30/2020 . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Sunday, March 29, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Letter
Sun 03/29 11:30 AM
Letter Regarding Amendment to Pretrial Schedule Filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert.(Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/16 1:11 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of Riverside Machinery Co., Inc.. (Tsukerman, Mark) |
|
28 | 28
answer
Answer, Amended Complaint
Thu 01/16 12:39 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of Riverside Machinery Co., Inc.. (Tsukerman, Mark) |
|
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
order
~Generic~ Order
Mon 01/13 4:09 PM
Protective Order signed on 1/13/2020 . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Mon 01/13 11:38 AM
Letter Advising Court of Consent by All Parties to entry of Proposed Protective Order Filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert.(Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh A to Proposed Protective Order | ||
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 01/03 2:34 PM
Amended Complaint against Riverside Machinery Co., Inc. Filed by William Dunnegan on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Dunnegan, William) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
answer
None
Wed 12/18 11:37 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of Riverside Machinery Co., Inc.. (Tsukerman, Mark) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
order
~Generic~ Order
Thu 12/12 3:21 PM
Order signed on 12/12/2019 dismissing certain claims without prejudice to repleading . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Motion, Protective Order
Thu 12/12 11:01 AM
Motion for Protective Order filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert with hearing to be held on 1/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) Responses due by 1/9/2020,. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Pleading Declaration of J. Joseph Bainton | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Reply
Fri 12/06 2:23 PM
Reply to Motion /Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to It's Motion to Dismiss the Adversary Complaint filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of Riverside Machinery Co., Inc.. (Tsukerman, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Opposition Brief
Tue 12/03 3:49 PM
First Opposition Brief to Motion to Dismiss filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 11/20 4:24 PM
Order signed on 11/20/2019 consolidating cases for pretrial discovery only and scheduling order . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Wed 11/20 1:10 PM
Amended Notice of Proposed Order Consolidating Cases for Pretrial Discovery Only and Pretrial Order filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
other
Certificate, Service
Tue 11/19 11:59 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of Riverside Machinery Co., Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/10/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) Objections due by 12/3/2019, (Tsukerman, Mark) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice, Hearing
Tue 11/19 11:30 AM
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Adversary Complaint filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of Riverside Machinery Co., Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/10/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW) Objections due by 12/3/2019, (Tsukerman, Mark) |
|
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 11/18 2:46 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding /Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Adversary Complaint filed by Mark Tsukerman on behalf of Riverside Machinery Co., Inc.. (Tsukerman, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Proposed Order
Tue 11/12 10:20 AM
Notice of Proposed Order Consolidating Cases for Pretrial Discovery and Pretrial Order (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Memorandum Endorsed Order
Fri 11/01 11:45 AM
Third So Ordered Stipulation and Order signed on 11/1/2019 Extending Time to Respond to Complaint to November 19, 2019. MEMO ENDORSEMENT: The Pre-Trial Conference for this adversary proceeding is adjourned to 11/20/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW). (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Tue 10/08 4:44 PM
Second So Ordered Stipulation signed on 10/8/2019 extending time to respond to the complaint to November 5, 2019 . (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Motion, Extend Time
Thu 09/19 11:57 AM
Motion to Extend Time of Pre-Trial Conference to November 6, 2019 filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 08/16 4:42 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Richard Weiss on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Weiss, Richard) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 08/16 4:28 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by William Dunnegan on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Dunnegan, William) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Fri 08/16 2:10 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Donald H. Steckroth on behalf of Riverside Machinery Co., Inc.. (Steckroth, Donald) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Tue 08/13 1:43 PM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 8/13/2019 Extending Time to Respond to Complaint . Defendant's Response Deadline shall be October 11. 2019. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Proposed Order
Tue 08/13 1:30 PM
Notice of Proposed Order Adjourning Pre-Trial Conference (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Tue 08/13 10:41 AM
First Notice of Proposed Order Stipulation Enlarging Time to Respond to Complaint filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
other
Certificate, Service
Tue 07/23 12:12 PM
Certificate of Service Affidavit of Service filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 07/10 11:33 AM
Second Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617, Answer due by 8/9/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tue 07/09 11:53 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 8/8/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Tue 07/09 4:38 PM
Request for a Amended Summons filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Mon 07/08 4:42 PM
Adversary case 19-01314 Complaint against Riverside Machinery Co., Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A - B |