Jalbert v. Kings Automotive Holdings, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11906
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11906
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-01319 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 12, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Kings Automotive Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig R. Jalbert, in his capacity as the Liquidation Trustee of the Liquidation Trust created pursuant to the Confirmed Revised Second Amended Joint Plan of Liquidation of the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession and the Official Committee of Unsecured Credit
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 12, 2022 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 05/12 8:17 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-1319 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (DePierola, Jacqueline) |
||
Wednesday, May 11, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Wed 05/11 1:26 PM
Notice of Dismissal without prejudice and without costs filed by William Dunnegan on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Dunnegan, William) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Affidavit of Service
Tue 09/24 9:59 AM
Affidavit of Service of Second Summons filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 09/13 9:38 AM
SECOND> Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 10/15/2019, (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Thu 09/12 6:16 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 07/10 3:15 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (MEW), Answer due by 8/9/2019, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 07/09 6:41 PM
Adversary case 19-01319 Complaint against Kings Automotive Holdings, LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by William Dunnegan, J. Joseph Bainton on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert. (Bainton, J. Joseph) |