Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45597
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2019
Case in other court:Florida Northern, 4:19-cv-00270
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:03 PM EST
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Defendant
CVS Health Corp.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Plaintiff
Taylor County Florida
Represented By
John Fletcher Romano
Romano Law Group
contact info
J. Eric Romano
Romano Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/04/2019 4:36 PM EST
Friday, June 14, 2019
1 1 294 pgs COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4521597.), filed by TAYLOR COUNTY, FLORIDA. (ROMANO, JOHN) [Transferred from flnd on 7/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
Monday, June 17, 2019
2 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney JOHN ROMANO Re1 Complaint - Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE RE-FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET. (toy) [Transferred from flnd on 7/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
3 3 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-99) re MDL 2804 to Northern District of Ohio. (toy) [Transferred from flnd on 7/10/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Email Request
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
4 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Northern. Case number 4:19-cv-00270. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]