1
|
|
1
Criminal COMPLAINT as to Christopher Lee Smith (1). (clou ) [2:19-mj-00265]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Christopher Lee Smith re1 Criminal Complaint. (clou) [2:19-mj-00265]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
Arrest Warrant Issued and delivered to USM 5/10/2019 in case as to Christopher Lee Smith. (clou ) [2:19-mj-00265]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Arrest of Christopher Lee Smith (clou ) [2:19-mj-00265]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Set Hearings as to Christopher Lee Smith: Initial Appearance set for 5/14/2019 at 02:30 PM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (cdod, ) [2:19-mj-00265]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. Initial Appearance as to Christopher Lee Smith held on 5/14/2019. AUSA Sherrie Capotosto appeared for the Government. AFPD Lindsay McCaslin is present. Defendant is present, advised of rights, charges and right to counsel. FPD appointed on the record. Gov't. motion for detention GRANTED. TEMP. detention ORDERED. Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 5/17/2019 at 12:00 PM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (Court Reporter FTR)(clou) [2:19-mj-00265]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/13/2019 and filed in open court 5/14/2019 in case as to Christopher Lee Smith. (clou ) [2:19-mj-00265]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit filed in open court 5/14/2019 by Christopher Lee Smith (clou) [2:19-mj-00265]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
Temporary Detention Order filed in open court 5/14/2019 as to Christopher Lee Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 5/14/2019. (clou ) [2:19-mj-00265]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard:Matter came on for Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Christopher Lee Smith on 5/17/2019. USA appeared through Sherrie Capotosto, AUSA. Defendant appeared through Lindsay McCaslin, AFPD and waived preliminary hearing on 3:19cr15. Preliminary hearing held on 2:19mj265. Argument of counsel. Evidence and witness presented. The Court found probable cause on both cases. Defendant waived detention hearing on both matters. Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (Court Reporter FTR.)(jjon) [2:19-mj-00265]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Christopher Lee Smith. Copies distributed as directed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 5/17/2019. (clou ) [2:19-mj-00265]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
NOTICE of Joint Proposed Order to Extend Time for Filing Indictment by Christopher Lee Smith(Capotosto, Sherrie) [2:19-mj-00265]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Order
|
12
|
|
12
ORDER - that the time within which an indictment must be filed is extended to July 12,2019. Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 6/11/2019. (clou ) [2:19-mj-00265]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5 17-2019 before Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. Court reporter/transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2019.(stewart, jody) [2:19-mj-00265]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Set Hearing as to Christopher Lee Smith: Arraignment set for 7/17/19 at 02:30 PM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (bpet, )
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
INDICTMENT RETURNED AND FILED IN OPEN COURT as to Christopher Lee Smith (1) count(s) 1. Defendant already in custody; on motion of the Government, the Court directed arraignment to be set for 7/17/19 at 2:30 p.m. (bpet, )
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Criminal Cover Sheet
|