Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45663
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2019
Case in other court:Connecticut, 3:19-cv-01041
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:09 PM EST
Defendant
Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
Represented By
Robert M. Frost, Jr.
Frost Bussert
contact info
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
Defendant
jonathan Sackler
Represented By
Robert M. Frost, Jr.
Frost Bussert
contact info
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Represented By
Janna Douville Eastwood
Spears Manning & Martini
contact info
Brian E. Spears
Spears Manning & Martini
contact info
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher M. Wasil
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Defendant
Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By
Agnieszka Romanowska Larson
Reid & Riege
contact info
Thomas V. Daily
Reid & Riege
contact info
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Represented By
Terri L. Chase
Jones Day - New York
contact info
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By
Christopher M. Wasil
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis Inc, f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC as the Successor in Interest of Kinray, LLC
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
Defendant
Caremark, L.L.C.
Defendant
CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. f/k/a Caremark PCS Health, L.P. d/b/a CVS Caremark
Defendant
Collegium Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
Defendant
Express Scripts, Inc.
Defendant
H.D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Defendant
Hickma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Defendant
Omnicare, Inc.
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
Defendant
OptumRX, Inc.
Defendant
OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
Defendant
John Kapoor
Represented By
Kurt M. Mullen
Nixon Peabody - Boston
contact info
Steven M. Richard
Nixon Peabody
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Inc
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904
Represented By
John P. D'Ambrosio
Cowdery & Murphy
contact info
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Represented By
Christopher M. Wasil
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher M. Wasil
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation
Represented By
David T. Martin
Cummings & Lockwood
contact info
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
Represented By
Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter
contact info
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By
Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter
contact info
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By
James K. Robertson, Jr.
contact info
Maureen Danehy Cox
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey
contact info
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Represented By
Christopher M. Wasil
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Catherine A. Mohan
Mccarter & English
contact info
Tara Anne Sheldon
Mccarter & English
contact info
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By
Catherine A. Mohan
Mccarter & English
contact info
Tara Anne Sheldon
Mccarter & English
contact info
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Christopher R. Drury
Shipman & Goodwin
contact info
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Represented By
Christopher R. Drury
Shipman & Goodwin
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By
Janna Douville Eastwood
Spears Manning & Martini
contact info
Brian E. Spears
Spears Manning & Martini
contact info
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Patrick M. Noonan
Donahue, Durham & Noonan
contact info
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By
Christopher R. Drury
Shipman & Goodwin
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Represented By
Kim E. Rinehart
Wiggin & Dana
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By
Kim E. Rinehart
Wiggin & Dana
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By
Kim E. Rinehart
Wiggin & Dana
contact info
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
Represented By
Robert M. Frost, Jr.
Frost Bussert
contact info
Defendant
David Sackler
Represented By
Robert M. Frost, Jr.
Frost Bussert
contact info
Plaintiff
Town of Wethersfield
Represented By
Margaret B. Ferron
Scott & Scott - Colchester
contact info
Judith S. Scolnick
Scott & Scott - New York
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/08/2019 3:04 PM EST
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5343171, filed by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc..(Larson, Agnieszka) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Transfer Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Walgreens Appearance,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-State Court Filings,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5-Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 NOTICE of Related Case by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc. (Larson, Agnieszka) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc. Notice of No Pending Motions(Larson, Agnieszka) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-State Court Docket Sheet
4 4 NOTICE by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc. Notice to Counsel re: Local Rule 5(b) (Larson, Agnieszka) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Larson, Agnieszka) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Agnieszka Romanowska Larson on behalf of Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc. (Larson, Agnieszka) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2019 Discovery due by 1/1/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 2/5/2020 Signed by Clerk on 7/2/2019 Related [+] [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-] is, Julia
8 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/2/2019 Related [+] [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-] is, Julia
9 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/2/2019 Related [+] [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-] is, Julia
10 10 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/2/2019 Related [+] [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-] is, Julia
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
11 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.,2 Notice of Related Case filed by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.,3 Notice (Other) filed by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.,4 Notice (Other) filed by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.,5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.,6 Notice of Appearance filed by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.,7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,8 Electronic Filing Order,9 Standing Protective Order,10 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 7/3/2019. Related [+] [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-] is, Julia
Att: 1 Standing Order on Removals
12 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Noonan on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Noonan, Patrick) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
13 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation. (Noonan, Patrick) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim E. Rinehart on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. (Rinehart, Kim) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Frost, Jr on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler (Frost, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
16 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Purdue Pharma Inc., Other Affiliate Purdue Holdings L.P., Other Affiliate Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. for Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Rinehart, Kim) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
17 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and Conduct the 26(f) Planning Conference1 Notice of Removal, by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Rinehart, Kim) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Mohan, Catherine) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
19 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Mohan, Catherine) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
20 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Sheldon, Tara) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
21 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint1 Notice of Removal, by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Richard Sackler. (Frost, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
22 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss, Answer, Or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and to Conduct the 26(f) Planning Conference 1 Notice of Removal, by Walmart, Inc..(Chase, Terri) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
23 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Spears on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC (Spears, Brian) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
24 24 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. D'Ambrosio on behalf of Actavis Inc f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (D'Ambrosio, John) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
25 25 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis Inc. (D'Ambrosio, John) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2019
26 26 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Martin on behalf of Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation (Martin, David) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
27 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation. (Martin, David) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
28 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and Conduct the 26(f) Planning Conference1 Notice of Removal, by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sheldon, Tara) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2019
29 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Janna Douville Eastwood on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC (Eastwood, Janna) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
30 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (Eastwood, Janna) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
31 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Drury on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Drury, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
32 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Drury, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
33 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and Conduct Rule 26(F) Planning Conference1 Notice of Removal, by John Kapoor. (Richard, Steven) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
34 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Wasil on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Wasil, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
35 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Wasil, Christopher) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
36 36 NOTICE by Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc. - Removal Statement(Larson, Agnieszka) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A and B
37 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and Conduct the Parties' 26(f) Planning Conference by Actavis Inc. (D'Ambrosio, John) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
38 38 NOTICE of Appearance by James K. Robertson, Jr on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc. (Robertson, James) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
39 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Danehy Cox on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc. (Cox, Maureen) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
40 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Edwin Dwyer on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Dwyer, Paul) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
41 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Dwyer, Paul) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
42 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cardinal Health Inc.. (Cox, Maureen) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
43 43 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/09/2019 to Answer, Move, or Respond to Complaint and Conduct 2(f) Conference by Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Cox, Maureen) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
44 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt M. Mullen on behalf of John Kapoor (Mullen, Kurt) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
45 45 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Alfred V. Covello for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/8/2019.(Lewis, D) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2019
46 46 ORDER granting17 ,21 ,22 ,28 ,33 ,37 ,43 consent motions for extension of time. The defendants shall have to and including 60 days after the court's decision on a motion to remand or the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's decision on conditional transfer, whichever is later, within which to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint and to conduct the parties' planning meeting. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 07/18/19. (Covello, Alfred) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2019
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
47 47 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Clerk, John W. Nichols, MDL Panel on 7/24/2019.(Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2019
48 48 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Connecticut. Case number 3:19-cv-01041. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]