Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45675
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2019
Case in other court:North Dakota, 3:19-cv-00139
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:10 PM EST
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Purdue Pharmaceutical Products, LP
Defendant
Purdue Products L.P.
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
Defendant
David A. Sackler
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Endo International plc
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Plaintiff
City of Fargo, North Dakota
Represented By
Jennie Lee Anderson
Andrus Anderson
contact info
Ian Ronald McLean
Serkland Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/08/2019 3:00 PM EST
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International plc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceutical Products L.P., Purdue Products L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, SpecGx LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000404) filed by Fargo, The City of.(js) [Transferred from ndd on 8/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
2 2 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International plc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceutical Products L.P., Purdue Products L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, SpecGx LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Watson Laboratories, Inc. (js) [Transferred from ndd on 8/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Fargo, The City of. (McLean, Ian) [Transferred from ndd on 8/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2019
4 4 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting3 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Erik R. Johnson terminated. (CS) [Transferred from ndd on 8/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
5 5 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Ronald McLean on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McLean, Ian) Modified on 7/24/2019 to restrict access. (as) [Transferred from ndd on 8/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
DOCKET CORRECTION re:5 NOTICE of Appearance. Filed in Error. Clerk's office restricted access to document. Pleading is signed by attorney Jennie Anderson who is not yet admitted to practice in the District of North Dakota. Attorney Anderson should file her Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Attorney Anderson will not be added to this case until she is admitted PHV. (as) [Transferred from ndd on 8/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
6 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-103) (certified copy) transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. Case transferred via ECF extract civil case feature.(as) [Transferred from ndd on 8/1/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
7 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Dakota. Case number 3:19-cv-00139. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
8 8 Attorney Appearance by Jennie Lee Anderson filed by on behalf of City of Fargo, North Dakota. (Anderson, Jennie)
Related: [-]