Security Water District et al v. USA
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-02187 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 28:2674 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Colorado, 1:19-cv-00649 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2020 3:25 AM EST |
Defendant
USA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemguard
|
|
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Pikes Peak Community Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Security Water District
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
71 | 71
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 11/17 10:44 AM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. as referenced granting 4033 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (282) in case 2:18-cv-03358-RMG; (127) in case 2:18-cv-03435-RMG; (116) in case 2:19-cv-01022-RMG; (53) in case 2:19-cv-01119-RMG; (44) in case 2:19-cv-01120-RMG; (43) in case 2:19-cv-01181-RMG; (48) in case 2:19-cv-01217-RMG; (81) in case 2:19-cv-01223-RMG; (123) in case 2:19-cv-01724-RMG; (70) in case 2:19-cv-02187-RMG; (61) in case 2:19-cv-02607-RMG; (30) in case 2:19-cv-03288-RMG; (31) in case 2:19-cv-03290-RMG; (23) in case 2:20-cv-02030-RMG; (105) in case 2:20-cv-02115-RMG) Motion to Withdraw Geoffrey Cook as Attorney for listed plaintiffs. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 11/17/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
70 | 70
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 11/16 12:06 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by United States of America, United States Air Force, United States Department of Defense, United States of America, United States Fairchild AFB, United States, United States Air Force, United States of America, United States Air National Guard Bureau, United States Department of the Air Force, The. Response to Motion due by 11/30/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cook, Geoffrey) |