|
GPO
Jul 08 2013
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part the Motion to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendants Larry Goldstone and Clarence G. Simmons 35; the Defendant Jane Starrett's Motion to Dismiss 36; and, the Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Complaint 39. (kw)
|
|
GPO
Dec 13 2013
MEMORANDUM OPINION by District Judge James O. Browning granting KPMG LLP's Motion to Intervene 125. (mla)
|
|
GPO
Mar 31 2014
ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commissions Motion for a Protective Order to Quash Defendants' Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition 163. (mla)
|
|
GPO
Mar 31 2014
ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting Defendants' Motion to Compel the Production of Documents by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission 199. mla)
|
|
GPO
Mar 31 2014
ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting Defendants' Motion to Compel a Sufficient Privilege Log by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission 200. (mla)
|
|
GPO
Mar 31 2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part the Plaintiff's Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Defendants' Responses to Requests for Admission Nos. 19 and 24 162. (mla)
|
|
GPO
Aug 23 2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND AMENDED ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning denying the Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of PCAOB Deposition Transcripts and Plaintiff's Notes and Memoranda of Interviews with Non-Party Witnesses 90; granting in part and denying in part Non-Party KPMG LLP's Motion to Quash, in Part, or Modify Subpoena to Produce Documents, and for Protective Order 91; and granting Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Motion for a Protective Order to Quash Defendants' Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition and Second and Third Requests for the Production of Documents 121. (mla)
|
|
GPO
Aug 23 2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Motion for a Protective Order to Quash Defendants' Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition 163. (mla)
|
|
GPO
Nov 04 2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION by District Judge James O. Browning granting 223 MOTION to File Surreply to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel a Privilege Log. (kg)
|
|
GPO
Aug 21 2015
ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning Concerning Intervenor KPMG's Proposed Redactions to the Sealed Memorandum Opinion and Order 364. (nrl)
|
|
GPO
Aug 22 2015
UNSEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning Denying Motion for Summary Judgment on Behalf of Larry Goldstone and Clarence G. Simmons and Memorandum of Law in Support 201; and Denying Memorandum of Point and Authorities in Support of Defendant Jane Starrett's Motion for Summary Judgment 206. (nrl)
|
|
GPO
May 10 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part 300 MOTION to Strike Errata Changing Testimony of Defendants' Proposed Experts Christopher Laursen and Christopher James, 292 MOTION to Exclude (Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Proffered Expert Testimony of Lawrence Weiner, Dale Kitchens, and Michael Mayer), 291 MOTION to Exclude And/Or Limit Testimony of Christopher Laursen, Joseph J. Floyd, William W. Holder, Steven M. Hilfer and Christopher M. James. (dmw)
|
|
GPO
Jun 03 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part 390 Motion in Limine (dmw)
|
|
GPO
Jun 09 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting 402 Motion in Limine No. 11 (dmw)
|
|
GPO
Jun 13 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part 394 Motion in Limine No. 3 (dmw)
|
|
GPO
Jun 13 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part 399 Motion in Limine No. 8 (dmw)
|
|
GPO
Jun 14 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part 493 Trial Brief (dmw)
|
|
GPO
Jun 21 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part 398 Motion in Limine No. 7 (dmw)
|
|
GPO
Jun 27 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part 400 Motion in Limine No. 9 (dmw)
|
|
GPO
Jun 27 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning denying 467 Motion to Continue Trial (dmw)
|
|
GPO
Jul 01 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part 395 Motion in Limine No. 4 (dmw)
|
|
GPO
Jul 01 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting 401 Motion in Limine No. 10 (dmw)
|
|
GPO
Jul 12 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part 474 Motion to Strike Investigative and Deposition Transcripts from SEC's Exhibit List (dmw)
|
|
GPO
Jul 20 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part 396 Motion in Limine No. 5 (dmw)
|
|
GPO
Jul 20 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning denying 397 Motion in Limine No. 6 (dmw)
|
|
GPO
Jan 26 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part the Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law 594. (kw)
|
|
GPO
Jan 31 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning denying 392 the Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commissions Motion in Limine to Exclude Argument or Evidence that the Defendants did not Violate Rule 13b2-2 as a Result of Providing the Tie-Out Document to KPMG (meq)
|