District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Amy Berman Jackson
Case #: 1:19-cv-02367
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2020 3:34 AM EST
Defendant
FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By
Bradley P. Humphreys
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Grace X. Zhou
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By
Bradley P. Humphreys
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Grace X. Zhou
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY
Represented By
Bradley P. Humphreys
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Grace X. Zhou
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM P. BARR
Represented By
Bradley P. Humphreys
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Grace X. Zhou
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
PETER STRZOK
Represented By
Richard A. Salzman
Heller, Huron, Chertkof & Salzman, PLLC
contact info
Julia Theresa Quinn
Doj-Crt
contact info
Aitan Dror Goelman
Zuckerman Spaeder, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Movant
DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON
Terminated: 10/07/2019
P.O. Box 9063
Miramar Beach, FL 32550


1. Former FBI Agent Sues Justice Department Over Firing (wsj.com)
Submitted Wed 08/07/2019
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
162 162 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Wed 04/09 1:02 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, MERRICK B. GARLAND, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY. Attorney Joshua Charles Abbuhl terminated. (Abbuhl, Joshua)
Related: [-]