Hill v. Keliher et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-01948 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Aug 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Texas Southern, 4:19-cv-02528 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2020 2:44 AM CST |
Defendant
Chester Donnally
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Russell Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alinda Wikert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Craig Watkins
133 N. Industrial Blvd. LB 19
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Heather Hill Washburne
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ray Wasburne
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joy Waller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas Tatham
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elisa Hill Summers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Pickett
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PBL Multi-Strategy Fund LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Terri Moore
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ty Miller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Margaret Keliher
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lyda Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert G Hill, III
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/10 3:23 PM
***PLEASE DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE of Under Rule 237a filed by Albert G Hill, III (Farrell, Thomas) Modified docket text per attorney on 9/10/2019 (aaa) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) | ||
Wednesday, September 04, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Response/Objection
Wed 09/04 3:07 PM
RESPONSE re:4 MOTION to Remand, filed by Chester Donnally, Lyda Hill, Margaret Keliher, Ty Miller, David Pickett, Elisa Hill Summers, Thomas Tatham, Joy Waller, Ray Wasburne, Heather Hill Washburne, Alinda Wikert. (epm) |
|
35 | 35
25
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Wed 09/04 3:04 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court grants Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Doc.33 ) and directs the clerk of the court to file as a separate document Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (Doc.33 -1), which is attached as an exhibit to Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation; grants Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court (Doc.4 ); denies Plaintiff's request to recover attorneys fees and costs (Doc.4 ); and remands this action to the 127th Judicial District Court, Harris County, Texas, from which it was removed. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/4/2019) (epm) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 08/28 1:48 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Sam A. Lindsay for all further proceedings. Judge Ed Kinkeade no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/28/2019) (chmb) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Leave to File
Fri 08/23 8:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Exceed Page Limitation filed by Chester Donnally, Lyda Hill, Margaret Keliher, Ty Miller, David Pickett, Elisa Hill Summers, Thomas Tatham, Joy Waller, Ray Wasburne, Heather Hill Washburne, Alinda Wikert (Dees, Tom) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
32 | 32
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 08/23 10:08 AM
MOTION For Entry of Order on Turnover Application filed by Albert G Hill, III (Farrell, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Agreed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Court Request For Recusal
Tue 08/20 3:27 PM
Court Request for Recusal: Judge Jane J. Boyle recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Ed Kinkeade for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:19-cv-1948-B. |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/20 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Related Case filed by Chester Donnally, Lyda Hill, Margaret Keliher, Ty Miller, David Pickett, Elisa Hill Summers, Thomas Tatham, Joy Waller, Ray Wasburne, Heather Hill Washburne, Alinda Wikert (Gruber, G) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Court Request For Recusal
Mon 08/19 8:54 AM
Court Request for Recusal: Judge Horan recused. Judge Rutherford assigned for matters that may be referred. (ewd) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Court Request For Recusal
Fri 08/16 3:59 PM
Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Jane J. Boyle for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:19-cv-1948-B. (axm) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Court Request For Recusal
Fri 08/16 8:22 AM
Court Request for Recusal: Judge Karen Gren Scholer recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Senior Judge A. Joe Fish for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:19-cv-1948-G. (ctf) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
qcref
Scholer
Thu 08/15 3:07 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) |
|
25 | 25
utility
Electronic Case Transferred In - District Transfer (Public Entry)
Thu 08/15 3:01 PM
Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-02528. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. |
|
Interdistrict transfer to US District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 8/15/2019, filed. (jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | ||
utility
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (Public Entry)
Thu 08/15 8:29 AM
Interdistrict transfer to US District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 8/15/2019, filed. (jdav, 4) |
||
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
15
pgs
order
Order Transferring to Another District
Thu 08/15 8:25 AM
ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to US District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division; granting MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas (Dallas Division) (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
23 | 23 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Michael Justin Lang as to Chester Donnally et al re:17 Order,, filed. (hlerma, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
22 | 22 Unopposed RESPONSE to5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas (Dallas Division) filed by Terri Moore, Craig Watkins, Russell Wilson. (Voss, Edwin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
21 | 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas (Dallas Division), filed by Albert G Hill, III.(Farrell, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
20 | 20 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Michael Justin Lang re:11 Order, filed. (bmendoza, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
19 | 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Albert G Hill, III, filed.(Farrell, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
18 | 18 EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 8/23/2019.), MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by PBL Multi-Strategy Fund LP, filed.(Fischman, Lawrence) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Brief in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Appendix in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
17 | 17 ORDER granting in part15 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Motion to Establish Schedule for Briefing and Resolution of Pending Motions and Request for Expedited Consideration. Responses to the Motion to Transfer Venue remain due 8/9/2019. Responses to the Motion to Remand are due August 23, 2019. Responses to all motions to dismiss are due September 6, 2019(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE Notice of Filing Regarding 2020 Action ECF 1964 by Chester Donnally, Margaret Keliher, Ty Miller, David Pickett, Elisa Hill Summers, Thomas Tatham, Joy Waller, Ray Wasburne, Heather Hill Washburne, filed. (Dees, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
15 | 15 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Motion to Establish Schedule for Briefing and Resolution of Pending Motions and Request for Expedited Consideration by Albert G Hill, III, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/21/2019.(Farrell, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Terri Moore, Craig Watkins, Russell Wilson, filed.(Voss, Edwin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
13 | 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Chester Donnally, Lyda Hill, Margaret Keliher, Ty Miller, David Pickett, Elisa Hill Summers, Thomas Tatham, Joy Waller, Ray Wasburne, Heather Hill Washburne, Alinda Wikert, filed.(Dees, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
12 | 12 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Michael Justin Lang as to Chester Donnally, David Pickett, Thomas Tatham, Joy Waller re:2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (agould, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
11 | 11 ORDER granting Edwin Armstrong Price Voss, Jr. Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice as to Terri More, Russell Wilson and Craig Watkins. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
10 | 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act, and Brief in Support by Ray Wasburne, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2019.(Dees, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9 DOCKETED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT TERMINATED. SUPPLEMENT to6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act, and Brief in Support by Ray Wasburne, filed.(Dees, Tom) Modified on 7/19/2019 (thanniable, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
8 | 8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act by Chester Donnally, Margaret Keliher, Ty Miller, David Pickett, Thomas Tatham, Joy Waller, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2019.(Gruber, Grady) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Lyda Hill, Alinda Wikert, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2019.(Huff, Carrie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Appendix - Declaration of Carrie Huff and Exhibits A to R, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6 DOCKETED IN ERROR. MOTION TERMINATED. FOR CORRECTED ENTRY, SEE DOCUMENT10 . MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Petition Pursuant to the Texas Citizens Participation Act, and Brief in Support by Ray Wasburne, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2019.(Dees, Tom) Modified on 7/19/2019 (thanniable, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas (Dallas Division) by Chester Donnally, Lyda Hill, Margaret Keliher, Ty Miller, David Pickett, Elisa Hill Summers, Thomas Tatham, Joy Waller, Ray Wasburne, Heather Hill Washburne, Alinda Wikert, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2019.(Dees, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4 MOTION to Remand by Albert G Hill, III, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2019. (Farrell, Thomas) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
3 | 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Chester Donnally, Margaret Keliher, Ty Miller, David Pickett, Elisa Hill Summers, Thomas Tatham, Joy Waller, Ray Wasburne, Heather Hill Washburne, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2019.(Dees, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2019-38645 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22778554) filed by Lyda Hill, Joy Waller, Margaret Keliher, Craig Watkins, PBL Multi-Strategy Fund LP, Thomas Tatham, Ty Miller, Heather Hill Washburne, Alinda Wikert, Terri Moore, Russell Wilson, Elisa Hill Summers, Chester Donnally, Ray Wasburne, David Pickett.(Gruber, Grady) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 8/15/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D-1, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D-2, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D-3, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit D-4, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit D-5, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit D-6, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit D-7, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit D-8, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit D-9, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit D-10, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit D-11, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit D-12, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit D-13 |