Madison County, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45702 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Virginia Western, 3:19-cv-00028 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:13 PM EST |
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Impax Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insource, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
8741 Landmark Road
Richmond, VA 23228 |
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OptumRX, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Henry Schein Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
3411 Silverside Road
Wilmington, DE 19180 |
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company
|
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
50 West Broad St., Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215 |
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AbbVie Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Barr Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Caremark, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-100
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Madison County, Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/26/2019 9:20 AM EDT |
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 Notice of Filing Requirement to Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response.[LINK:Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form.] This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (hnw) [Transferred from vawd on 8/19/2019.] | |
4 | 4 Notice of Filing Requirement to Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response.[LINK:Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form.] This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (hnw) [Transferred from vawd on 8/19/2019.] | |
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
20 | 20
![]() |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
![]() |
|
23 | 23
![]() |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
![]() |