Arizona District Court
Judge:Douglas L Rayes
Case #: 2:14-cv-00476
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2014
Terminated:Aug 11, 2014
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 7:40 PM MST
Defendant
Stream Global Services-US Incorporated
Represented By
Nonnie L Shivers
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Lauren Ann Crawford
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Stream International Incorporated
Represented By
Nonnie L Shivers
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Lauren Ann Crawford
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Plaintiff
Jessica Farhanjeh
Represented By
Robert Eric Yen
Yen Pilch & Landeen PC
contact info
Caroline A Pilch
Yen Pilch & Landeen PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shawn Farhanjeh
Represented By
Robert Eric Yen
Yen Pilch & Landeen PC
contact info
Caroline A Pilch
Yen Pilch & Landeen PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Stream Global Services - AZ Incorporated
Terminated: 03/10/2014
Represented By
Nonnie L Shivers
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Lauren Ann Crawford
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Stream Global Services Incorporated
Terminated: 03/10/2014
Represented By
Nonnie L Shivers
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Lauren Ann Crawford
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM MST
Monday, August 11, 2014
23 23 ORDER granting the parties'22 Stipulation. ORDERED dismissing this case with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/11/2014. (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 05, 2014
22 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Action with Prejudice by Stream Global Services-US Incorporated, Stream International Incorporated.(Shivers, Nonnie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 30, 2014
21 21 NOTICE of Settlement Notice of Settlement by Jessica Farhanjeh, Shawn Farhanjeh. (Pilch, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 01, 2014
20 20 Minute Order: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. This matter is reassigned to Judge Douglas L Rayes for all further proceedings. All documents filed in this action should bear the initials DLR as part of the complete case number (see revised case number above). All pending deadlines and hearings are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 06, 2014
19 19 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jessica Farhanjeh, Shawn Farhanjeh. (Pilch, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 30, 2014
18 18 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Stream Global Services-US Incorporated, Stream International Incorporated. (Crawford, Lauren)
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jessica Farhanjeh, Shawn Farhanjeh. (Pilch, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 29, 2014
16 16 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Jessica Farhanjeh, Shawn Farhanjeh. (Pilch, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 22, 2014
15 15 ORDER granting leave to depose inmate. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/22/2014. (DGC, nvo)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2014
13 13 Additional Attachments to Main Document re:10 Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) by Defendants Stream Global Services-US Incorporated, Stream International Incorporated. (Crawford, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2014
14 14 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Scheduling Conference held on 5/15/2014. Discovery due by 8/29/2014. (See minute entry for additional information) (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.) Hearing held 3:30 PM to 3:45 PM.(TCA)
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' Notice of Service of Initial 26(a) Disclosure Statement by Jessica Farhanjeh, Shawn Farhanjeh . (Pilch, Caroline)
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE re: Service of Defendants' Initial Disclosure Statement by Stream Global Services - AZ Incorporated, Stream Global Services Incorporated, Stream Global Services-US Incorporated, Stream International Incorporated . (Crawford, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2014
10 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jessica Farhanjeh, Shawn Farhanjeh. (Pilch, Caroline)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Ann Crawford on behalf of Stream Global Services - AZ Incorporated, Stream Global Services Incorporated, Stream Global Services-US Incorporated, Stream International Incorporated. (Crawford, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2014
8 8 ORDER. The Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2014 at 4:00 PM is VACATED and RESET for 5/15/2014 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/3/2014. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2014
7 7 ORDER. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2014 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/25/2014. (DGC, nvo)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2014
6 6 MINUTE ORDER: that pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge David G. Campbell. All further pleadings should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 14-476-PHX-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KMG)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2014
5 5 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KMG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2014
4 4 ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal Defendants Stream Global Services-US, Inc. and Stream International, Inc.'s Answer to Amended Complaint by Stream Global Services-US Incorporated, Stream International Incorporated.(Shivers, Nonnie)
Related: [-]
3 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX 0970-10211238. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David K Duncan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 14-00476 PHX-DKD. Magistrate Election form attached.(MHU)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Election Form
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stream Global Services-US Incorporated, Stream International Incorporated. (submitted by Nonnie Shivers) (MHU)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2014-004310. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX 0970-10211238 filed by Stream Global Services-US Incorporated, Stream International Incorporated.(submitted by Nonnie L Shivers)(MHU)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet