Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45737
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-01850
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:16 PM EST
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Plaintiff
Freeborn County, Minnesota
Represented By
Yvonne M. Flaherty
Lockridge Grindal Nauen
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/04/2019 12:58 PM EDT
Monday, July 15, 2019
1 1 158 pgs COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6996522) filed by Freeborn County, Minnesota. Filer requests summons issued. (Flaherty, Yvonne) [Transferred from mnd on 8/28/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-1850 JNE/DTS. (ACH) [Transferred from mnd on 8/28/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued as to Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (ACH) [Transferred from mnd on 8/28/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Noramco, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (ACH) [Transferred from mnd on 8/28/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Summons Issued as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (ACH) [Transferred from mnd on 8/28/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2019
NOTICE: The case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of Ohio (kt) [Transferred from mnd on 8/28/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-105) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster. (kt) [Transferred from mnd on 8/28/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
7 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Minnesota. Case number 0:19-cv-01850. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]