Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45744
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2019
Case in other court:Alabama Northern, 4:19-cv-01270
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:18 PM EST
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Plaintiff
City of Argo, Alabama
Represented By
Jere L. Beasley
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Rhon Eugene Jones
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Richard Douglas Stratton
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
William J. Sherrer
Sherrer & Sherrer
contact info
William Robert Sutton
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Jon Ryan Kral
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Jeffrey Donald Price
Beasley Allen
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/04/2019 1:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 08, 2019
Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3408167, NDAL receipt #B4601099743. (Sutton, William) Modified on 8/9/2019 (JLC). [Transferred from alnd on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 154 pgs COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed by City of Argo, Alabama.(JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by City of Argo, Alabama. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement by City of Argo, Alabama. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
4 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. via certified U.S. Mail on this the 14th day of August, 2019. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2019
5 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Argo, Alabama. Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019; Cephalon, Inc. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019; Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2019
6 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Argo, Alabama. Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
7 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Argo, Alabama. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019; Noramco, Inc. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2019
8 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Argo, Alabama. Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019; McKesson Corporation served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019; Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019; Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL No. 2804: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL No. 2804; Copies of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically mailed to Clerk of Court in the Northern District of Ohio. (JLC) [Transferred from alnd on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
10 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 4:19-cv-01270. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]