County of Ventura v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45747 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 42:1396 - Tort Negligence |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2019 |
Case in other court: | California Central, 2:19-cv-06799 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:18 PM EST |
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Co.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Jane Does
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
Actavis LLC C/O United Corporate Services, Inc. 874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
County of Ventura
County Government Center 800 South Victoria Avenue
Ventura, CA 93009 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/04/2019 2:14 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |