Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45754
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2019
Case in other court:Louisiana Eastern, 2:19-cv-11775
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:18 PM EST
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By
Paul Byrd Simon
Gordon Arata
contact info
Samuel E. Masur
Gordon Arata Montgomery Barnett
contact info
Defendant
JM SMITH CORPORATION
Represented By
Philip C. Brickman
Degan, Blanchard & Nash
contact info
Sidney W. Degan, III
Degan, Blanchard & Nash
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By
Kelly Juneau Rookard
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Douglas John Moore
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
David W. O'Quinn
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Kelly Juneau Rookard
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Douglas John Moore
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Kerry J. Miller
Frilot, Partridge, Kohnke & Clements
contact info
David W. O'Quinn
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Represented By
Kelly Juneau Rookard
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Douglas John Moore
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Kerry J. Miller
Frilot, Partridge, Kohnke & Clements
contact info
David W. O'Quinn
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Defendant
Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.
Represented By
Steven Brian Perry
Allen & Gooch - Lafayette
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By
Gregory T. Stevens
Phelps Dunbar
contact info
Harry Rosenberg
Phelps Dunbar
contact info
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By
Gregory T. Stevens
Phelps Dunbar
contact info
Harry Rosenberg
Phelps Dunbar
contact info
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Represented By
Stacey Denise Williams
Blanchard, Walker, O'Quin & Roberts
contact info
W. Michael Adams
Blanchard, Walker, O'Quin & Roberts
contact info
Scott R. Wolf
Blanchard, Walker, O'Quin & Roberts
contact info
Defendant
Miley Meds Pharmacy LLC
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Represented By
Russell R. Dickson
Wiener, Weiss & Madison
contact info
Frank H. Spruiell, Jr.
Wiener, Weiss & Madison
contact info
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
A'Dair Ragan Flynt
Liskow & Lewis
contact info
Tyler D. Trew
Liskow & Lewis
contact info
James Alcee Brown
Liskow & Lewis (new Orleans)
contact info
James A. Brown
Liskow & Lewis
contact info
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Defendant
Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By
Madison Sharko
Barrasso, Usdin, Kupperman, Freeman & Sarver
contact info
Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver
contact info
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
Kelly Juneau Rookard
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Douglas John Moore
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Kerry J. Miller
Frilot, Partridge, Kohnke & Clements
contact info
David W. O'Quinn
Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Represented By
Paul Byrd Simon
Gordon Arata
contact info
Samuel E. Masur
Gordon Arata Montgomery Barnett
contact info
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Represented By
Lawrence Bradley Hancock
Holland & Knight
contact info
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By
Paul Byrd Simon
Gordon Arata
contact info
Samuel E. Masur
Gordon Arata Montgomery Barnett
contact info
Defendant
RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC,
Represented By
Ezra D. Church
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Philadelphia
contact info
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
Defendant
Smith Drug Company
Represented By
Philip C. Brickman
Degan, Blanchard & Nash
contact info
Sidney W. Degan, III
Degan, Blanchard & Nash
contact info
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Represented By
Gregory T. Stevens
Phelps Dunbar
contact info
Harry Rosenberg
Phelps Dunbar
contact info
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By
Kathryn Marie Knight
Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann
contact info
James Dalton Courson
Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann
contact info
Defendant
Walgreen Company
Represented By
John F. Olinde
Chaffe Mccall
contact info
Peter J. Rotolo, III
Chaffe Mccall
contact info
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By
John F. Olinde
Chaffe Mccall
contact info
Peter J. Rotolo, III
Chaffe Mccall
contact info
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Represented By
Kathryn Marie Knight
Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann
contact info
James Dalton Courson
Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann
contact info
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Represented By
Kelly Cambre Bogart
Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister, Weinstock & Bogart
contact info
Nicole M. Boyer
Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister, Weinstock & Bogart
contact info
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By
Robert E. Dille
Kean, Miller, Hawthorne, D'Armond, Mccowan & Jarman
contact info
Richard Munice Crump
Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson
contact info
Shelley K. Napolitano
Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson
contact info
Defendant
Acatvias Laboratories, Inc.-Salt Lake City
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Allegran Plc
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By
Caroline Kay Darwin
Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips
contact info
Thomas MacDougall Womack
Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By
Caroline Kay Darwin
Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips
contact info
Thomas MacDougall Womack
Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By
Caroline Kay Darwin
Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips
contact info
Thomas MacDougall Womack
Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By
Franklin J. Foil
contact info
Defendant
Indivior Inc.
Represented By
Glenn Michael Farnet
Kean, Miller, Hawthorne, D'Armond, Mccowan & Jarman
contact info
Karen M. Fontana
Kean Miller
contact info
Defendant
Impax Laboratories, LLC
Defendant
H.D. Smith LLC
Represented By
Robert E. Dille
Kean, Miller, Hawthorne, D'Armond, Mccowan & Jarman
contact info
Richard Munice Crump
Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson
contact info
Shelley K. Napolitano
Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson
contact info
Defendant
Family Drug Mart LLC
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Kerry J. Miller
Frilot, Partridge, Kohnke & Clements
contact info
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Kerry J. Miller
Frilot, Partridge, Kohnke & Clements
contact info
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Represented By
Michael C Mims
Bradley Murchison Et Al (no)
contact info
Natalie J. Dekaris
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
C. William Bradley, Jr.
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Richard S. Crisler
Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea
contact info
Leland G Horton
Bradley Murchison
contact info
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By
John Powers Wolff, III
Keogh, Cox & Wilson
contact info
Chad Anthony Sullivan
Keogh, Cox & Wilson
contact info
Defendant
CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC
Represented By
Andy Joseph Dupre
Flanagan Partners
contact info
Thomas M. Flanagan
Flanagan Partners
contact info
Camille E. Gauthier
Flanagan Partners
contact info
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By
Andy Joseph Dupre
Flanagan Partners
contact info
Thomas M. Flanagan
Flanagan Partners
contact info
Camille E. Gauthier
Flanagan Partners
contact info
Defendant
CVS Orlando FL Distribution, L.L.C
Represented By
Andy Joseph Dupre
Flanagan Partners
contact info
Thomas M. Flanagan
Flanagan Partners
contact info
Camille E. Gauthier
Flanagan Partners
contact info
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
Represented By
Andy Joseph Dupre
Flanagan Partners
contact info
Thomas M. Flanagan
Flanagan Partners
contact info
Camille E. Gauthier
Flanagan Partners
contact info
Defendant
Anda Inc
Represented By
Craig D. Dillard
Foley & Lardner
contact info
Craig Douglas Dillard
Gardere, Wynne & Sewell, Llp (houston)
contact info
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC
Represented By
John Powers Wolff, III
Keogh, Cox & Wilson
contact info
Chad Anthony Sullivan
Keogh, Cox & Wilson
contact info
Plaintiff
Town of Pearl River
Represented By
Lawrence E. Abbott
Cotten Schmidt & Abbott
contact info
Ross Forrest Lagarde
contact info
Brigid E. Collins
Law Office Of Frank G. Desalvo
contact info
Sarah Perkins Reid
Cotten, Schmidt & Abbott
contact info
Walter John Leger, Jr.
Leger & Shaw
contact info
Matthew S. Landry
Leger & Shaw
contact info
Franklin G. Shaw
Leger & Shaw
contact info
Walter John Leger, III
Leger & Shaw
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/04/2019 2:38 PM EDT
Friday, July 19, 2019
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Tammany Parish, 22nd JDC, case number 2019-13024 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7762875) filed by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Sales, L.L.C..Attorney Thomas Mac Dougall Womack added to party Allergan Finance LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Mac Dougall Womack added to party Allergan Sales, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Mac Dougall Womack added to party Allergan USA, Inc.(pty:dft).(Womack, Thomas) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 165 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan Sales, L.L.C., Allergan USA, Inc. (Womack, Thomas) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2019
4 4 Directive of the Clerk re1 Notice of Removal filed by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Sales, L.L.C. (mp) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah S. Vance. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on July 22, 2019.(mp) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKesson Corporation .(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 7/23/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
7 7 NOTICE of Collateral Proceedings by McKesson Corporation . (Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 7/23/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
9 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond re1 Notice of Removal by Walmart, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Orlando FL Distribution, LLC, CVS TN Distribution, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Company.Attorney Kathryn Marie Knight added to party Walmart, Inc.(pty:dft).(Knight, Kathryn) Modified filers/linkage on 7/24/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond. **1. Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s). 2. Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2019
11 11 ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/25/2019. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
12 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond re1 Notice of Removal by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corporation.(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to move, answer or otherwise respond re1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/25/2019. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
14 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Town of Pearl River. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/6/2019.(Leger, Walter) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
15 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal or Otherwise File Responsive Pleadings as to Joining Manufacturing Defendants by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.(Rookard, Kelly) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
16 16 Notice of Compliance by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan Sales, L.L.C., Allergan USA, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal.(Womack, Thomas) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 & 3 combined
17 17 ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal or Otherwise File Responsive Pleadings as to Joining Manufacturing Defendants. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/30/2019. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
18 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc. re: rec. doc.1(Perry, S.) Modified text on 7/31/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
19 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc. (Perry, S.) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
20 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond. **Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decidedby the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
21 21 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the18 Motion. It is hereby Ordered that LOUISIANA WHOLESALE DRUG COMPANY, INC., without waiver of any defenses, shall be granted a 21-day extension of time to file a responsive pleading after a decision by the JPML regarding transfer of this matter to the MDL. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 08/02/2019. (am) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2019
22 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Respond re1 Notice of Removal by JM Smith Corporation, Smith Drug Company.(Brickman, Philip) Modified text on 8/6/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
23 23 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by H.D. Smith, LLC identifying corporate parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation. (Crump, Richard) Modified text on 8/7/2019 (pp). [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
24 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Plead re1 Notice of Removal by H.D. Smith, LLC. Attorney Richard Munice Crump added to party H.D. Smith, LLC(pty:dft).(Crump, Richard) Modified text/removed referral on 8/7/2019 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
25 25 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re23 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. Filing attorney should have entered the Corporate Parent at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary. (pp) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
26 26 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re24 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Plead re1 Notice of Removal. **1. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'.** (mm) (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
27 27 ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re22 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Respond re1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/7/2019. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
28 28 ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Plead re1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/7/2019. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
29 29 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are hereby stayed pending the decision of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel regarding transfer. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/8/2019.(mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2019
30 30 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2019
31 31 Order of MDL Transfer to District of Ohio Northern. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.(jeg) [Transferred from laed on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter
Friday, August 30, 2019
32 32 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:19-cv-11775. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]