City of Slidell v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45769 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 03, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Eastern, 2:19-cv-11771 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:19 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J M Smith Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Indivior, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Smith Drug Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Acatvias Laboratories, Inc.-Salt Lake City
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allegran Plc
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Orlando FL Distribution, L.L.C
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Impax Laboratories, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Slidell City
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/04/2019 3:53 PM EDT |
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.] | |
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
17 | 17 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond re1 Notice of Removal. **1. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.] | |
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
![]() |
|
21 | 21
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
22 | 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re21 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, Or Otherwise Respond re1 Notice of Removal. **1. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'. ** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.] | |
23 | 23 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re20 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter AmerisourceBergen Corporation as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 9/3/2019.] | |
24 | 24
![]() |
|
25 | 25
![]() |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
![]() |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
![]() |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
29 | 29
![]() |