Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert E Wier
Referred: Matthew A Stinnett
Case #: 5:19-cv-00376
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2019
Terminated:Apr 27, 2023
Case in other court:Fayette Co. Circuit Court, 19-CI-2998
Last checked: Sunday Mar 15, 2020 6:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Jim Craig
Represented By
Laraclay Drake Parker
Golden Law Office, PLLC
contact info
Justin Peterson
Golden Law Office, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
American Retirement Corporation
Represented By
Donald L. Miller, II
Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lou
contact info
J. Peter Cassidy, III
Quintaros, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lex
contact info
Matthew Coleman Cocanougher
Quintaros, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lex
contact info
Plaintiff
BLC Lexington SNF, LLC
Represented By
Donald L. Miller, II
Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lou
contact info
J. Peter Cassidy, III
Quintaros, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lex
contact info
Matthew Coleman Cocanougher
Quintaros, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lex
contact info
Plaintiff
Brookdale Senior Living Communities, Inc.
Represented By
Donald L. Miller, II
Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lou
contact info
J. Peter Cassidy, III
Quintaros, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lex
contact info
Matthew Coleman Cocanougher
Quintaros, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lex
contact info
Plaintiff
Brookdale Senior Living Inc.
Represented By
Donald L. Miller, II
Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lou
contact info
J. Peter Cassidy, III
Quintaros, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lex
contact info
Matthew Coleman Cocanougher
Quintaros, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A. - Lex
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Dennis Ray Craig
Terminated: 12/05/2019
Represented By
Laraclay Drake Parker
Golden Law Office, PLLC
contact info

GPO Aug 13 2020
OPINION & ORDER: 1. The Court DENIES Defendant's motion to dismiss (DE 15); 2. The Court GRANTS Brookdale's motion to compel and enjoin Defendant (DE 19); 3. The Court DENIES Defendant's motion to strike (DE 20); 4. The Court COMPELS Defendant to submit the claims now pending in Fayette Circuit Court to arbitration under the terms of the arbitration agreement. Further, the Court ENJOINS Defendant from further pursuing the claims in state court; and 5. The Court STAYS this matter until arbitration is concluded. The parties are directed to file, by 11/23/2020, a joint status report regarding the progress of arbitration. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 8/13/2020.(JJ)cc: COR

Docket last updated: 04/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 27, 2023
50 50 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Terminate Motions Thu 04/27 2:38 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS49 , DISMISSES this matter with prejudice, and STRIKES this matter from the Court's docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert E. Wier on 4/27/2023. (KMP)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Thu 04/27 8:04 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review: re49 Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal by BLC Lexington SNF, LLC (KMP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
49 49 motion Proposed Agreed Order Wed 04/26 11:55 AM
Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal by BLC Lexington SNF, LLC. (Cassidy, J.)
Related: [-]