California Central District Court
Judge:Cormac J Carney
Referred: Paul L Abrams
Case #: 2:19-cv-08164
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2019
Terminated:Sep 14, 2023
Case in other court:9th CCA, 23-02940
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 18, 2020 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Mark S. Knighton
1920 La Mesa Drive
Santa Monica, CA 90402
Represented By
Johnny Kim
J Kim Aplc
contact info
Defendant
NextEngine, Inc.
Represented By
Johnny Kim
J Kim Aplc
contact info
Defendant
ShapeTools, LLC
Represented By
Johnny Kim
J Kim Aplc
contact info
Plaintiff
Bigfoot Ventures Limited
Represented By
Roman A Popov
Morton And Associates LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 28, 2025
75 75 appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Tue 04/01 2:43 PM
OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,69 filed by Bigfoot Ventures Limited. CCA # 23-2940 Because the district court acted within its discretion by vacating trial in order to carefully consider the parties views on the important threshold inquiry of plaintiff adequacy, we hold that the district court did not abuse its discretion by vacating trial to hear the Motion. AFFIRMED. (mat)
Related: [-]