Washington Eastern District Court
Judge:Stanley A Bastian
Case #: 1:14-cv-03032
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause05:704 Labor Litigation
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2014
Terminated:Jul 11, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 12:05 PM PST
Defendant
Mercer Canyons Inc
Represented By
Aurora Rose Janke
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Michael T Reynvaan
Perkins Coie - Sea
contact info
Frederick Brian Rivera
Perkins Coie - Sea
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Amador
Represented By
Joachim Morrison
Columbia Legal Services - Wen
contact info
Lori A Jordan Isley
Columbia Legal Services - Yak
contact info
Adam Berger
Schroeter Goldmark & Bender
contact info
Martin S Garfinkel
Schroeter Goldmark & Bender
contact info
David Solis
Columbia Legal Services - Yak
contact info
Plaintiff
Bacilio Ruiz Torres
Represented By
Joachim Morrison
Columbia Legal Services - Wen
contact info
Lori A Jordan Isley
Columbia Legal Services - Yak
contact info
Adam Berger
Schroeter Goldmark & Bender
contact info
Martin S Garfinkel
Schroeter Goldmark & Bender
contact info
David Solis
Columbia Legal Services - Yak
contact info
Unknown
State of Washington Employment Security Department
Attorney General's Office 1125 Washington Street
Olympia, WA 98504
Represented By
Bruce L Turcott
Attorney General Of Washington - Oly
contact info

GPO Aug 19 2014
ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISCOVERY PROTECTIVE ORDER - granting in part 27 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (CC, Case Administrator)
GPO Nov 14 2014
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER ON IMMIGRATION STATUS DISCOVERY AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL - granting 35 Motion for Protective Order; and denying 39 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (CC, Case Administrator)
GPO Jan 23 2015
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - denying 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (CC, Case Administrator)
GPO Feb 04 2015
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER - denying 84 Motion to Stay; and denying 84 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (CC, Case Administrator)
GPO Apr 08 2015
CLASS CERTIFICATION ORDER - granting 51 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (CC, Case Administrator)
GPO Jan 17 2017
ORDER ON MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND MOTION TO AMEND BRIEFING DEADLINES - denying 233 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 234 Motion to Expedite; granting 236 Motion; and granting 237 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. (CC, Case Administrator)
GPO Feb 24 2017
ORDER STRIKING TRIAL DATES, DENYING PRETRIAL MOTIONS, AND DENYING MOTION TO EXPEDITE; DENIED AS MOOT ECF No. 205 Motion in Limine to Bar Evidence of Immigration Status; DENIED AS MOOT ECF No. 224 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment-Joint Employment of M&L Class Members; DENIED AS MOOT ECF No. 227 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Inaccurate Information Class; DENYING ECF No. 258 Motion to Expedite Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TR, Case Administrator)
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, July 11, 2019
277 277 2 pgs order Order Closing File Thu 07/11 12:34 PM
ORDER CLOSING FILE. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AY, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]