Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804

Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:19-op-45815
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2019
Case in other court:Puerto Rico, 3:19-cv-01821
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:24 PM EST
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
Defendant
RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceutical, L.P.
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
Defendant
David A. Sackler
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
Defendant
Other Corporations ABC and 1-100
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
Defendant
Stuart D. Baker
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Defendant
Actavis LLC
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Defendant
Allergan PLC
Defendant
Allergen Finance LLC
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Defendant
Anda Inc
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
Defendant
Miami-Luken Inc
Defendant
Noramco Inc
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Plaintiff
Municipality of Villalba
Represented By
Randi A. Kassan
Sanders Phillips Grossman
contact info
Douglas H.H. Sanders
Sanders Phillips Grossman
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/30/2019 11:44 AM EDT
Friday, August 30, 2019
1 1 272 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6565554.), filed by Municipality of Villalba, Puerto Rico. Service due by 12/2/2019,(Sanders, Douglas) Modified on 9/3/2019 to edit docket text (ab). [Transferred from prd on 9/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons,
Att: 10 Summons,
Att: 11 Summons,
Att: 12 Summons,
Att: 13 Summons,
Att: 14 Summons,
Att: 15 Summons,
Att: 16 Summons,
Att: 17 Summons,
Att: 18 Summons,
Att: 19 Summons,
Att: 20 Summons,
Att: 21 Summons,
Att: 22 Summons,
Att: 23 Summons,
Att: 24 Summons,
Att: 25 Summons,
Att: 26 Summons,
Att: 27 Summons,
Att: 28 Summons,
Att: 29 Summons,
Att: 30 Summons,
Att: 31 Summons,
Att: 32 Summons,
Att: 33 Summons,
Att: 34 Summons,
Att: 35 Summons,
Att: 36 Summons,
Att: 37 Summons,
Att: 38 Summons,
Att: 39 Summons,
Att: 40 Summons,
Att: 41 Summons,
Att: 42 Summons,
Att: 43 Summons,
Att: 44 Summons,
Att: 45 Summons
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
2 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg) [Transferred from prd on 9/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
3 3 Summons Issued as to AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergen Finance, LLC, Anda, Inc., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEPHALON, INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Endo Health Solutions Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, McKESSON CORPORATION, Miami-Luken, Inc., NORAMCO, INC., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceutical L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies, Inc., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler-Lefcourt, Specgx LLC, Stuart D. Baker, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC. (arg) [Transferred from prd on 9/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Thursday, September 19, 2019
4 4 Minute Order to involved Clerks entered in MDL No. 2804 informing of the electronic transfer to the Northern District of Ohio. Order becomes effective upon receipt of a certified copy of CTO-111 from the transferee court. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel John W. Nichols on 9/19/2019. (ab) [Transferred from prd on 9/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-111) for the transfer of this case to N.D. of Ohio. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/19/2019. (ab) [Transferred from prd on 9/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Tag Along Actions,
Att: 2 Nef
6 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CTO-111 received from the Northern District of Ohio. (ab) [Transferred from prd on 9/25/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
7 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Puerto Rico. Case number 3:19-cv-01821. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]