Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11934

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:19-ap-50381
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2019
Terminated:May 27, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Samson Resources Corporation
Two West Second Street
Tulsa, OK 74103
Represented By
Christopher Michael De Lillo
Richards, Layton & Finger, P. A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Diane S. Jones
12 Amwich Ct.
Waldorf, MD 20602
Represented By
Diane S. Jones
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, March 29, 2021
21 21 1 pgs order District Court re: Appeal Mon 03/29 11:02 AM
Final Order By District Court Judge Richard G. Andrews, Re: Appeal on Civil Action Number: 20-725 (BAP 20-12) , Affirmed Related [+] (JS)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Memorandum
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
20 20 appeal Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal Tue 06/02 8:49 AM
Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal to District Court. Civil Action Number: 20-725 ; BAP Number: 20-12 Related [+] (BA)
Related: [-] 14
Sunday, May 31, 2020
19 19 court RETIRED - BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 06/01 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/31/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 17
Saturday, May 30, 2020
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/31 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/30/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, May 29, 2020
17 17 court VAN-440a Clerk's Notice Re Appeal Fri 05/29 2:09 PM
Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing of Appeal Related [+] (JS)
Related: [-] 14
16 16 court VAN-440 Clerk's Notice Re Appeal Fri 05/29 1:59 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing of Appeal Related [+] (JS) Modified on 5/29/2020 (JS)
Related: [-] 14
15 15 appeal Transmittal of Record on Appeal Fri 05/29 1:39 PM
Transmittal of Record on Appeal to District Court. BAP 20-12 Related [+] (JS)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 Memorandum Order on Appeal
14 14 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 05/29 1:33 PM
Notice of Appeal . Receipt Number 0, Fee Amount $298. Related [+] Filed by Diane S. Jones. (JS)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, May 28, 2020
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/28 10:04 AM
Certificate of Service . Related [+] Filed by . (BA)
Related: [-] 11 ,12
12 12 court Generic BNC Notice (PDF) Thu 05/28 8:24 AM
BNC Notice of Memorandum Order Related [+] (BA)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/27 1:35 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50381 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
11 11 15 pgs order Order Tue 05/26 3:54 PM
MEMORANDUM Order Dismissing the Adversary Complaint of Diane S. Jones Related [+] Order Signed on 5/26/2020. (JMW)
Related: [-] 4 ,5 ,7 ,8 ,9 ,10
Wednesday, November 27, 2019
10 10 3 pgs notice Completion of Briefing - Notice Wed 11/27 2:04 PM
Notice of Completion of Briefing. Judge Shannon is reviewing this case Related [+] Filed by Samson Resources Corporation (Maddox, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 ,4 ,5 ,7 ,8 ,9
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, November 15, 2019
9 9 answer Reply Fri 11/15 6:01 PM
Reply (The Reorganized Debtors' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Adversary Complaint of Diane S. Jones) Related [+] Filed by Samson Resources Corporation (De Lillo, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 ,4 ,5 ,7 ,8
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
8 8 misc Brief Thu 11/14 1:31 PM
Brief in Support of Reply of Reorganized Debtors' Motion to Dismiss the Adversary Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Diane S. Jones . (SJS)
Related: [-] 7
Att: 1 Attachment
Att: 2 Attachment
Att: 3 Attachment
Att: 4 Attachment
7 7 answer Response Thu 11/14 1:29 PM
Response to Reorganized Debtors' Motion to Dismiss the Adversary Complaint Related [+] Filed by Diane S. Jones (SJS)
Related: [-] 4
6 6 motion Allow - Motion Thu 11/14 1:21 PM
Motion to Allow Darrell Parker to be added as a Plaintiff to Adversary Related [+] Filed by Diane S. Jones. The case judge is Brendan Linehan Shannon. (SJS)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, October 25, 2019
5 5 misc Brief Fri 10/25 2:24 PM
Brief (The Reorganized Debtors' Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Adversary Complaint of Diane S. Jones) Related [+] Filed by Samson Resources Corporation. (Maddox, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
4 4 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding - Motion Fri 10/25 2:20 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Samson Resources Corporation Related [+]. (Maddox, Robert)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 21, 2019
3 3 misc Letter (Bk) Tue 10/22 9:18 AM
Letter Updating Debtor's Phone Number. Filed by Diane S. Jones . (SJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2019
2 2 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/01 12:59 PM
Certificate of Service . Related [+] Filed by Diane S. Jones . (LCN)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/25 11:31 AM
Adversary case 19-50381 Complaint by Diane S. Jones against Samson Resources Corporation. Receipt Number 92093, Fee Amount $350 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/26/2019. (COH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 49 pgs Exhibit Complaint
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
Att: 3 Exhibit Mailing Envelope