Twin Falls County, Idaho v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45828 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 26, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Idaho, 1:19-cv-00348 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:25 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
purdue pharma l.p
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKessson Corporation
a Delaware corporation One Post St.
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
|
Defendant
Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo International PLC
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Twin Falls County, Idaho
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/30/2019 2:30 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, September 26, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |