GALLO v. WEAVER et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Colville |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-01260 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 29, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 28, 2020 5:50 AM EDT |
Defendant
DALE BROWN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN DOE
|
|
Defendant
STEVEN DRISCOLL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN KEAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOSEPH RUGGERY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHAD WEAVER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LOUIS ANTHONY GALLO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/05/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
145 | 145
appeal
USCA Order - (Does Not Terminate Appeal)
Mon 07/01 6:01 PM
ORDER of USCA as to143 Notice of Appeal,, filed by LOUIS ANTHONY GALLO (pdb3) |
|
144 | 144
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing (Case Number & Case Manager Assigned)
Mon 07/01 4:17 PM
USCA Case Number 24-2175 for143 Notice of Appeal,, filed by LOUIS ANTHONY GALLO. USCA Case Manager Pamela (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (pdb3) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
143 | 143
appeal
Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Required)
Thu 06/27 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to118 Rule 58 Judgment, Add and Terminate Parties by LOUIS ANTHONY GALLO. Filing fee $605, receipt number APAWDC-8334559. Motion for IFP N/A. Certificate of Appealability N/A. Court Reporter(s): Moore. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (Geary, Noah) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
142 | 142
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 06/26 10:15 AM
ORDER granting141 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Support of140 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and/or for New Trial by CHAD WEAVER. Defendants Brief in Support of Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and/or for New Trial is due on or before July 26, 2024. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 6/26/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
141 | 141
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 06/25 6:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Support of 140 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and/or for New Trial by CHAD WEAVER. (Bradley, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
140 | 140
motion
Judgment as a Matter of Law (FRCvP 50) New Trial
Tue 06/25 6:46 PM
MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and/or , MOTION for New Trial by CHAD WEAVER. (Bradley, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |