Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:19-cv-06177
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2019
Case in other court:USDC, District of Columbia (Washington, DC), 1:19-cv-02498-TNM
Last checked: Saturday Mar 28, 2020 1:58 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Joe G. Hollingsworth
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LAWANDA YVETTE EARL-SCOTT
Represented By
Wendy R. Fleishman
Lief Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Karen Elizabeth Evans
The Cochran Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
DONALD V. SCOTT
Represented By
Wendy R. Fleishman
Lief Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Karen Elizabeth Evans
The Cochran Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Monday, October 28, 2019
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/28 8:00 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 10/28 7:59 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 10/28 7:57 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2019
10 10 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 10/03 3:31 PM
CASE TRANSFERRED in from United States District Court for the District of District of Columbia (Washington, DC); Case Number 1:19-cv-02498-TNM. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Thu 10/03 3:36 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: USDC, District of Columbia (Washington, DC), 1:19-cv-02498-TNM, Scott et al -v- Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-06177-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-153), MDL No. 2741 cc: JPMDL (tnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
9 9 EMAIL from the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr)
Related: [-]
8 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO_153) dated 9/25/19 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Vince Chhabria for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2741) (ztnr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/27/2019, (ztth)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
7 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE by DONALD V. SCOTT, LAWANDA YVETTE EARL-SCOTT. MONSANTO COMPANY waiver sent on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/27/2019. (Evans, Karen); Modified on 9/10/2019 (ztth).
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2019
6 6 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 08/26/2019. (lctnm3)
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Wendy R. Fleishman shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/26/2019. (lctnm3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2019
5 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
Related: [-]
Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
4 4 ERRATA of Complaint by EARL-SCOTT Y. LAWANDA, DONALD V. SCOTT.(Evans, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Monday, August 19, 2019
3 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Wendy R. Fleishman, :Firm- Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, :Address- 250 Hudson Street, 8th Floor, New York, NY 10013. Phone No. - (212) 355-9500. Fax No. - (212)355-9592 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6329756. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EARL-SCOTT Y. LAWANDA, DONALD V. SCOTT (Evans, Karen)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 3:16-md-2741. (Evans, Karen)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6329635) filed by DONALD V. SCOTT, EARL-SCOTT Y. LAWANDA.(Evans, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons