New York Western District Court
Case #: 6:19-cr-06098
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2019
Last checked: Friday Oct 04, 2019 3:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Khonesavahn Vongxay (1)
Represented By
Bryan Scott Oathout
contact info
Robert G. Smith
contact info
Robert Scott King
Law Office Of Robert King, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sean C. Eldridge
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/04/2019 4:37 AM EDT
Monday, March 05, 2018
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Phoumano Duangtavilay (1), Khonesavahn Vongxay (2), Kongchay Kongthong (3), Manivone Phommaviseth (4), James Vongxay (5), Chandy Vongxay (6), Keith Surian (7), Phetnalay Douangtavilay (8), Phou Daoreuang (9), Danisha Floyed (10), Jerimiah Torres (11), Pathana Vongxay (12), Kongdeuane Vongxay (13). (NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
2 2 Order to Seal Case as to Phoumano Duangtavilay, Khonesavahn Vongxay, Kongchay Kongthong, Manivone Phommaviseth, James Vongxay, Chandy Vongxay, Keith Surian, Phetnalay Douangtavilay, Phou Daoreuang, Danisha Floyed, Jerimiah Torres, Pathana Vongxay, Kongdeuane Vongxay.. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 3/5/18.(NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
Arrest of Phoumano Duangtavilay, Khonesavahn Vongxay, James Vongxay, Phetnalay Douangtavilay, Phou Daoreuang, Jerimiah Torres, Kongdeuane Vongxay (NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman:Date of Arrest: 3/6/18. Appearances: Sean Eldridge, AUSA, Sarah Whitcomb, USPO, Kerry Chartier, USPO, Jacquelyn Finucane, USPO, Robert Wood, Esq., Robert Smith, Esq., Michael Scibetta, Esq., Matthew Lembke, Esq., David Morabito, Esq. Initial Appearance as to Khonesavahn Vongxay, Phetnalay Douangtavilay, Phou Daoreuang, Jerimiah Torres, Kongdeuane Vongxay held on 3/6/2018. Defendant advised of rights and charges, defendants request court-appointed counsel.Added attorney Robert G. Smith for Khonesavahn Vongxay,Matthew R. Lembke for Phetnalay Douangtavilay,Michael P. Scibetta for Kongdeuane Vongxay. David R. Morabito assigned provisionally for Phou Daoreuang and to provide a detailed financial affidavit to Court in 10 days. Defendant Jerimiah Torres advises that he will be able to retain counsel - Robert Wood, Esq. to assist defendant with his financial affidavit and names of counsel if needed. Status of Counsel Conference set for 3/8/2018 02:00 PM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman for Jerimiah Torres. The government is not moving for detention on all defendants, all defendants are released on conditions recommended by pretrial. Conditions set. Status Conference re: Khonesavahn Vongxay, Phetnalay Douangtavilay, Phou Daoreuang, Kongdeuane Vongxay set for 5/7/2018 09:30 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Time Excluded as to Khonesavahn Vongxay, Phetnalay Douangtavilay, Phou Daoreuang, Kongdeuane Vongxay from: 3/6/18 through 5/7/18 in the interest of justice. (Court Reporter Diane Martens.)(NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 07, 2018
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 3/6/18.(NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
10 10 Appearance Unsecured Bond Entered as to Khonesavahn Vongxay in amount of $ 100,000.00, (NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
15 15 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/6/18 in case as to Khonesavahn Vongxay. (NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 10, 2018
33 33 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Khonesavahn Vongxay. (NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
Attorney update in case as to Kongchay Kongthong. Attorney Bryan Scott Oathout for Kongchay Kongthong added. (NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 22, 2018
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Khonesavahn Vongxay: The Court is in receipt of correspondence from attorney Robert King, Esq. re: matter. Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 3/30/2018 09:30 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. (NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Khonesavahn Vongxay: Per request by Robert King, Esq. Attorney Appointment Hearing reset for 3/29/2018 04:15 PM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. (NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
53 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman: Appearances: Robert Smith, Esq, Robert King, Esq. w/defendant, Sean Eldridge, AUSA, Jacqulyne Finucane, USPO. Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Khonesavahn Vongxay held on 3/29/2018. Robert Scott King, Esq. advises that he has been retained by Khonesavahn Vongxay. Attorney Robert G. Smith terminated in case as to Khonesavahn Vongxay. Discovery is being organized by the government and is to be provided. Status Conference remains set for 5/7/2018 09:30 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. (Court Reporter Diane Martens.)(NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 04, 2018
58 58 MOTION to Adjourn the status conference, MOTION to Continue the speedy indictment clock by USA as to Phoumano Duangtavilay, Khonesavahn Vongxay, Kongchay Kongthong, Manivone Phommaviseth, James Vongxay, Chandy Vongxay, Keith Surivan, Phetnalay Douangtavilay, Phou Daoreuang, Danisha Floyd, Jerimiah Torres, Kongdeuane Vongxay. (NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
60 60 ORDER granting58 Motion to Adjourn status conference as to Phoumano Duangtavilay (1), Khonesavahn Vongxay (2), Kongchay Kongthong (3), Manivone Phommaviseth (4), James Vongxay (5), Chandy Vongxay (6), Keith Surivan (7), Phetnalay Douangtavilay (8), Phou Daoreuang (9), Danisha Floyd (10), Jerimiah Torres (11), Kongdeuane Vongxay (13); granting58 Motion to Continue as to Phoumano Duangtavilay (1), Khonesavahn Vongxay (2), Kongchay Kongthong (3), Manivone Phommaviseth (4), James Vongxay (5), Chandy Vongxay (6), Keith Surivan (7), Phetnalay Douangtavilay (8), Phou Daoreuang (9), Danisha Floyd (10), Jerimiah Torres (11), Kongdeuane Vongxay (13). Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 5/4/18.(NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
61 61 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Phoumano Duangtavilay, Khonesavahn Vongxay, Kongchay Kongthong, Manivone Phommaviseth, James Vongxay, Chandy Vongxay, Keith Surivan, Phetnalay Douangtavilay, Phou Daoreuang, Danisha Floyd, Jerimiah Torres, Kongdeuane Vongxay: Status Conference reset for 6/22/2018 10:00 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. (NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 21, 2018
83 83 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Khonesavahn Vongxay Time excluded from 6/21/18 until 8/3/18. Status Conference set for 8/3/2018 09:30 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 6/21/18.(NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 19, 2018
87 87 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Khonesavahn Vongxay, Kongchay Kongthong: Status Conference reset for 8/13/2018 10:30 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. (NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 13, 2018
99 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman: Appearances: S. Eldridge, AUSA, B. Oathout, Esq., B. King, Esq., B. DeCarolis, Esq. w/defendants. Status Conference as to Khonesavahn Vongxay, Kongchay Kongthong, Kongdeuane Vongxay held on 8/13/2018. Defendants request an adjournment to continue their review of discovery and communications with the government re: potential resolution. The government will provide counsel w/outline of proposed plea offer. Status Conference set for 10/2/2018 02:00 PM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Time Excluded as to Khonesavahn Vongxay, Kongchay Kongthong, Kongdeuane Vongxay from: 8/13/18 through 10/2/18 in the interest of justice. (Court Reporter Digital recording.)(NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 23, 2018
CJA 20 as to Khonesavahn Vongxay: Authorization to Pay Robert Smith, Esq. Amount: $ 971.08, Voucher # 0209.0656047. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 8/14/18.(NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 02, 2018
114 114 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman: Appearances: S. Eldridge, AUSA, R. King, Esq. w/defendant. Status Conference as to Khonesavahn Vongxay held on 10/2/2018. The government t o provide all parties with a written proposed plea agreement by 10/5/18. No further appearances scheduled. Time Excluded as to Khonesavahn Vongxay from: 10/2/18 through 10/19/18 in the interest of justice. (Court Reporter Digital recording.)(NNR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 26, 2018
128 128 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Phoumano Duangtavilay, Khonesavahn Vongxay, Kongchay Kongthong, Manivone Phommaviseth, James Vongxay, Chandy Vongxay, Keith Surivan, Phetnalay Douangtavilay, Phou Daoreuang, Danisha Floyd, Jerimiah Torres, Pathana Vongxay, Kongdeuane Vongxay Time excluded from 12/26/2018 until 02/15/2019 pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §3161(h)(7). Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 12/26/2018.(LMD) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 15, 2019
129 129 TEXT ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Phoumano Duangtavilay, Khonesavahn Vongxay, Kongchay Kongthong, Manivone Phommaviseth, James Vongxay, Chandy Vongxay, Keith Surivan, Phetnalay Douangtavilay, Phou Daoreuang, Danisha Floyd, Jerimiah Torres, Pathana Vongxay, Kongdeuane Vongxay. Time excluded from 2/15/2019 until 4/25/2019 at the request of government counsel and without objection from defense counsel in the interest of justice pursuant to 18 USC § 3161(h)(7). Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 02/15/2019. (LMD) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
139 139 TEXT ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Phoumano Duangtavilay, Khonesavahn Vongxay, Kongchay Kongthong, Manivone Phommaviseth, James Vongxay, Chandy Vongxay, Keith Surivan, Phetnalay Douangtavilay, Phou Daoreuang, Danisha Floyd, Jerimiah Torres, Pathana Vongxay, Kongdeuane Vongxay Time excluded from 4/29/2019 until 6/13/2019 in the interest of justice pursuant to 18 USC § 3161(h)(7)(A) and requested by the government and agreed to by all defense counsel. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 04/29/2019. (LMD) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2019
145 145 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Phoumano Duangtavilay, Khonesavahn Vongxay, Kongchay Kongthong, Manivone Phommaviseth, James Vongxay, Chandy Vongxay, Keith Surivan, Phetnalay Douangtavilay, Phou Daoreuang, Danisha Floyd, Jerimiah Torres, Pathana Vongxay, Kongdeuane Vongxay Time excluded from 7/12/2019 until 9/17/2019 in the interest of justice pursuant to 18 USC § 3161(h)(7)(A). Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 07/12/2019. (LMD) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
Set/Reset Hearings as to Khonesavahn Vongxay: Plea Agreement Hearing set for 9/26/2019 12:00 PM before Hon. David G. Larimer. (PR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2019
Set/Reset Hearings as to Khonesavahn Vongxay: Plea Agreement Hearing reset for 10/1/2019 10:30 AM before Hon. David G. Larimer. (PR) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2019
152 152 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Phoumano Duangtavilay, Khonesavahn Vongxay, Kongchay Kongthong, Manivone Phommaviseth, James Vongxay, Chandy Vongxay, Keith Surivan, Phetnalay Douangtavilay, Pathana Vongxay Time excluded from 9/30/2019 until 11/15/2019. Time Excluded as the above defendants from 9/30/2019 to 11/15/2019 in the interest of justice pursuant to 18 USC § 3161(h)(7)(A). Status Conference set for 11/15/2019 4:00 PM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman's successor. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 09/30/2019. (LMD) [6:18-mj-00543-JWF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2019
153 153 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Khonesavahn Vongxay. (BK)
Related: [-]