Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:19-cv-06402
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2019
Terminated:Dec 05, 2023
Case in other court:Washington Western, 2:19-cv-01372
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 08, 2020 1:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Joe G. Hollingsworth
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Richard Mythen
Represented By
Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Corrie Yackulic Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 12/05 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Daniel Richard Mythen (Yackulic, Corrie)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Closed Mon 12/11 4:17 PM
MDL 2741 MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, civil case no. 3:19-cv-06402-VC Mythen v. Monsanto Company is terminated. cc: JPMDL (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/31 10:37 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 10/31 10:36 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 10/31 10:35 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
5 5 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 10/11 2:21 PM
Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-01372. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Fri 10/11 2:23 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re: 3:16-md-02741 VC; Western District of Washington (Seattle), 2:19-cv-01372 MAT, Mythen v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-06402 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 155 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2019
4 4 MDL 2741 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 155); in re Roundup Products Liability Litigation; Northern District of California; assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. (TH)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
3 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Monsanto Company. (GT)
Related: [-]
Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (GT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
2 2 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in NDCA, case number in other court 16-md-02741-VC ; filed by Plaintiff Daniel Richard Mythen. (Yackulic, Corrie)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Monsanto Company with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Corrie Johnson Yackulic added to party Daniel Richard Mythen(pty:pla), filed by Daniel Richard Mythen.(Yackulic, Corrie)
Related: [-] ceipt # 0981-5905410
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons