Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Brian J Davis
Referred: James R Klindt
Case #: 3:19-cv-01175
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Oct 16, 2019
Terminated:Nov 15, 2021
Case in other court:Fourth Judicial Circuit, 2019-CA-6697
Last checked: Monday Apr 13, 2020 6:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Asbury Automotive Group, Inc.
Represented By
Christine E. Howard
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Brett Purcell Owens
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Florida Automotive Services LLC
Represented By
Christine E. Howard
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Brett Purcell Owens
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Defendant
CN Motors, LLC
Represented By
Christine E. Howard
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Brett Purcell Owens
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bruce Bernstein
Represented By
Shands M. Wulbern
The Law Office Of Shands M. Wulbern, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
47 47 misc Bill of costs - proposed Tue 11/23 3:30 PM
PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC.(Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Christine Howard,
Att: 2 Exhibit Cost Backups
Monday, November 15, 2021
46 46 order Judgment Mon 11/15 10:29 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC against Bruce Bernstein. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/15/2021. (Attachment: # 1 Blank Bill of Costs)(KEM)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
45 45 18 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Fri 11/12 12:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING 31 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants, terminate all pending motions and close the file. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/12/2021. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
44 44 respm Response to motion Wed 11/10 9:17 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re40 MOTION In Limine filed by Bruce Bernstein. (Wulbern, Shands)
Related: [-]
43 43 misc Pretrial statement Wed 11/10 5:38 PM
PRETRIAL statement by Bruce Bernstein.(Wulbern, Shands)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit B-1,
Att: 5 Exhibit C
42 42 respm Response to motion Wed 11/10 9:33 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re41 MOTION In Limine filed by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC. (Owens, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
41 41 motion In Limine Wed 11/03 9:43 PM
MOTION In Limine by Bruce Bernstein. (Wulbern, Shands)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion In Limine Wed 11/03 11:40 AM
MOTION In Limine by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC. (Owens, Brett)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
39 39 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/29 5:40 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: 38 Defendants' Motion to Conduct Pretrial Conference via Video Conference is DENIED. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 10/29/2021. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
38 38 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/26 10:48 AM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically TO CONDUCT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC. (Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
37 37 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/25 1:23 PM
ORDER granting 36 Defendants' Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, Designation of Counsel and Consent to Act for Steven Cupp. Steven Cupp may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants. Mr. Cupp shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if he has not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 10/25/2021. (MDC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
36 36 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/21 5:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Steven R. Cupp to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18845659 for $150 by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC. (Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
35 35 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 07/20 12:09 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC. (Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
34 34 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/06 6:02 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bruce Bernstein.(Wulbern, Shands)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
33 33 discov Deposition Wed 06/16 4:20 PM
DEPOSITION of James Lux taken on June 3, 2020 re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC. . (Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
32 32 discov Deposition Wed 06/16 4:18 PM
DEPOSITION of Bruce Bernstein taken on January 29, 2020 re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC. .(Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2,
Att: 2 Exhibit 6,
Att: 3 Exhibit 7,
Att: 4 Exhibit 20,
Att: 5 Exhibit 21,
Att: 6 Exhibit 23
31 31 motion Summary Judgment Wed 06/16 4:01 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC.(Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jan Handley
Monday, May 10, 2021
30 30 order Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order Mon 05/10 1:30 PM
SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. The following settings and deadlines shall now apply: Dispositive motions due by 7/16/2021; Pretrial statement due by 11/10/2021; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 12/6/2021 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/10/2021. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
29 29 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 04/14 10:57 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Amend Case Management and Scheduling Order and for Enlargement of Deadlines and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. The Motion is denied to the extent that it seeks an extension of the discovery deadline. The Motion is granted to the extent that an amended Case Management and Scheduling Order will enter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 4/14/2021. (KEB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
28 28 16 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Tue 04/13 4:43 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law to the extent set forth in the Order. Defendants shall provide full and complete responses to Requests to Produce Nos. 1, 2, and 3 no later than 5/14/2021. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 4/13/2021. (KEB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
27 27 notice Notice of change of address Thu 03/25 3:19 PM
NOTICE of change of address by Shands M. Wulbern (Wulbern, Shands)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
26 26 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 01/25 10:44 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: 25 Defendants' Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline is GRANTED. The dispositive motion deadline will be reset following resolution of Docket Entries 21 and 23 . Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 1/25/2021. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 01/21 3:56 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically TO EXTEND DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC. (Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/06 12:15 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC. (Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 12/28 5:15 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Bruce Bernstein. (Wulbern, Shands)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
22 22 respm Response to motion Wed 12/23 2:07 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re21 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC.(Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, December 10, 2020
21 21 motion Compel Thu 12/10 8:59 PM
Second MOTION to Compel Discovery by Bruce Bernstein.(Wulbern, Shands)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Monday, November 09, 2020
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 11/09 4:42 PM
ORDER denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 11/9/2020. (KAW)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
19 19 order Case management and scheduling order Mon 10/05 5:02 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. The following settings and deadlines now apply: Discovery due by 12/30/2020: Dispositive motions due by 1/29/2021; Pretrial statement due by 5/19/2021; Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 6/7/2021 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 10/5/2020. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 09/29 5:21 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: 16 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Case Management and Scheduling Order is GRANTED. An amended case management and scheduling order will enter. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/29/2020. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2020
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/28 4:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC. (Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
16 16 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 09/21 4:22 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Bruce Bernstein. (Wulbern, Shands)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
15 15 adr Mediation report Wed 09/16 11:09 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on September 15, 2020. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Coleman, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
14 14 respm Response to motion Mon 07/27 3:55 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC.(Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit cited pages from plaintiff's deposition
Monday, July 13, 2020
13 13 motion Compel Mon 07/13 11:21 AM
MOTION to Compel Discovery by Bruce Bernstein.(Wulbern, Shands)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
12 12 utility Case Referred to Mediation Thu 11/21 1:28 PM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (PAM)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Case management and scheduling order Wed 11/20 4:56 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/30/2020; Conduct mediation hearing by 10/15/2020; Dispositive motions due by 10/30/2020; Pretrial statement due by 2/10/2021; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 3/1/2021 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/20/2019.(AMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mediation Report Form,
Att: 2 Docket Sheets
Monday, November 18, 2019
10 10 misc Case Management Report Mon 11/18 1:45 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Wulbern, Shands)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Fri 11/15 1:42 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC. Related case(s): n (Howard, Christine) Modified on 11/15/2019 (PAM)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Fri 11/15 1:40 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC. (Howard, Christine) Modified on 11/15/2019 to edit text (PAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
7 7 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Fri 11/08 2:50 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Bruce Bernstein. (Wulbern, Shands)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2019
6 6 order Related case order and track 2 notice Fri 11/01 1:58 PM
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/1/2019.(CKS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Management Report Form,
Att: 2 Consent Letter and Form
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/23 12:45 PM
ANSWER to 4 Complaint by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC.(Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
4 4 cmp Complaint Wed 10/16 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors, LLC, Florida Automotive Services LLC with Jury Demand filed by Bruce Bernstein. (Originally filed in State Court)(BD)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of appearance Wed 10/16 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Purcell Owens on behalf of Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., CN Motors LLC d/b/a Coggin Nissan, Florida Automotive Services LLC (Owens, Brett)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/16 10:38 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-1175-J-39JRK. (SJB)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 10/16 10:21 AM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, case number 2019-CA-6697 filed in State Court on 9/23/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16031925 filed by All Defendants.(Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT 1 - State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet 4 - Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents 5 - State Court Other Documents (Exhibit A to Notice),
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet 6 - Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal