Culpeper County, Virginia v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45849 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441nr |
Case Filed: | Oct 17, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Virginia Western, 3:19-cv-00037 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:28 PM EST |
Defendant
OptumRX, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Henry Schein Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Impax Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insource, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
8741 Landmark Road
Richmond, VA 23228 |
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
50 West Broad St., Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215 |
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AbbVie Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Barr Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Caremark, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-100
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Holding Company
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Culpeper County, Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/21/2019 10:20 AM EDT |
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
22 | 22
![]() |
|
23 | 23
![]() |
|
24 | 24
![]() |
|
25 | 25
![]() |
|
26 | 26
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
![]() |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
![]() |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
![]() |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
![]() |