Ellis County v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45860 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action |
Case Filed: | Oct 18, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Texas Southern, 4:19-cv-02256 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:30 PM EST |
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
IVAX LLC
|
|
*** SELECTION REQUIRED
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dr Nicolas Padron
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
8741 Landmark Road
Richmond, VA 23228 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Theodore E. Okechuku
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Phamaceutical Industries Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AbbVie Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Andrews
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 200, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 414, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 100, inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Insys Manufacturing LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Ellis County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/21/2019 12:19 PM EDT |
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() |
|
19 | 19
![]() |
|
20 | 20
![]() |
|
21 | 21
![]() |
|
22 | 22
![]() |
|
23 | 23
![]() |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
![]() |
|
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
![]() |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
28 | 28
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
![]() |
|
30 | 30
![]() |
|
31 | 31
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
33 | 33
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
![]() |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/18/2019.] | ||
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
![]() |