Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12307

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:19-ap-50612
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2019
Terminated:Oct 31, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
A&R Transport Inc.
Represented By
A&R Transport Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan D. Halperin, as co-trustee of the M & G Corporation Litigation Trust
Represented By
Scott A. Ziluck
Halperin Battaglia Benjiza, LLP
contact info
J. Kate Stickles
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ankura Trust Company, as co-trustee of the M & G Corporation Litigation Trust
Represented By
J. Kate Stickles
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, October 31, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/31 10:00 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50612 Closed ~ Inadvertent Filing (LB)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
6 6 1 pgs order Order Fri 10/25 2:24 PM
Order Closing Adversary Proceeding. Order Signed on 10/25/2019. (JMW)
Related: [-]
5 5 order VAN-438 Order Closing Adversary Proceeding Fri 10/25 2:22 PM
Order closing adversary proceeding Signed on 10/25/2019. (JMW)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Fri 10/25 11:31 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Proposed Order Closing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Monday, October 21, 2019
3 3 notice Withdrawal of Document - Notice Mon 10/21 5:49 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Complaint Related [+] Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 10/21 10:35 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50612 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9493979, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2019
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 10/18 4:50 PM
Adversary case 19-50612 Complaint by Alan D. Halperin and Ankura Trust Company, as co-trustees of the M & G Corporation Litigation Trust against A&R Transport Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 1/16/2020. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A