Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12307

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:19-ap-50670
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2019
Terminated:Mar 31, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Diners Club
Represented By
Diners Club
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan D. Halperin
Represented By
Scott A. Ziluck
Halperin Battaglia Benjiza, LLP
contact info
J. Kate Stickles
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ankura Trust Company, as co-trustee of the M & G Corporation Litigation Trust
Represented By
Ankura Trust Company
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 31, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/31 9:25 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50670 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
20 20 notice Dismissal - Notice Mon 03/30 4:01 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/25 12:02 PM
Certificate of Service regarding service of Order (I) Modifying Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings; (II) Further Extending the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; and (III) Further Extending the Deadline to Serve Notice of Referral to Mediation. Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
18 18 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/24 12:58 PM
Order (I) Modifying Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings; (II) Further Extending the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint; and (III) Further Extending the Deadline to Serve Notice of Referral to Mediation. Signed on 3/23/2020 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2020
17 17 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 03/23 11:41 AM
Certification of Counsel With Respect to Proposed Order (I) Modifying Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings; (II) Further Extending the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint; and (III) Further Extending the Deadline to Serve Notice of Referral to Mediation Related [+]. Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-] 2673
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
16 16 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 02/26 4:14 PM
Affidavit of Service regarding service of Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
15 15 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/20 3:26 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Order Signed on 2/20/2020. (JMW)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation
14 14 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 02/20 2:16 PM
Certification of Counsel With Respect to Stipulation Further Extending the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order
Monday, January 06, 2020
13 13 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 01/06 11:55 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Trustees of the M&G Corporation Litigation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2020
12 12 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Fri 01/03 4:18 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion of the Trustees of the M & G Corporation Litigation Trust for Entry of an Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Avoidance Actions. Filed by Trustees of the M&G Corporation Litigation Trust. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2019
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/27 2:48 PM
Certificate of Service for Motion of the Trustees of the M&G Corporation Litigation Trust for Entry of an Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Avoidance Actions [Main Docket No. 2683]. Filed by Trustees of the M&G Corporation Litigation Trust. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/27 2:36 PM
Certificate of Service for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 544, 547, 548, 549 and/or 550 [Main Docket No. 2673]. Filed by Trustees of the M&G Corporation Litigation Trust. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2019
9 9 cmp Alias Summons Fri 12/20 5:22 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Diners Club. Related [+] Tickle due by: 2/18/2020. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 18, 2019
8 8 motion Extend - Motion Wed 12/18 1:27 PM
Motion to Extend Time /Motion Of The Trustees Of The M & G Corporation Litigation Trust For Entry Of An Order Extending Time For Service Of Process Pursuant To Rules 7004(A) And 9006(B)(1) Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure And Rule 4(M) Of The Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure In Certain Avoidance Actions Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin, M&G Corporation Litigation Trust.. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2019
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 12/16 11:47 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Trustees of the M&G Corporation Litigation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2019
6 6 8 pgs order Order Mon 12/09 12:18 PM
Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings. Signed on 12/9/2019 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
5 5 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Tue 12/03 8:55 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of the Trustees of the M & G Corporation Litigation Trust for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C §§ 544, 547, 548, 549 and/or 550 Related [+] Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-] 3
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - List of Avoidance Actions
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Revised Proposed Order
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Black Line Revised Proposed Order
Friday, November 08, 2019
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 11/08 7:56 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Diners Club. Related [+] (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
3 3 motion Approve - Motion Wed 11/06 2:21 PM
Motion to Approve (Motion of the Trustees of the M & G Corporation Litigation Trust for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C §§ 544, 547, 548, 549 and/or 550). Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/2/2019. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 10/21 10:50 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50670 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9494112, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2019
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 10/18 9:05 PM
Adversary case 19-50670 Complaint by Alan D. Halperin and Ankura Trust Company, as co-trustees of the M & G Corporation Litigation Trust against Diners Club. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 1/16/2020. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A