Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12307

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:19-ap-50690
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2019
Terminated:May 05, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Panalytical Inc.
Represented By
Panalytical Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan D. Halperin
Represented By
J. Kate Stickles
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Scott A. Ziluck
Halperin Battaglia Benjiza, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/05 9:54 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50690 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
12 12 notice Dismissal - Notice Mon 05/04 6:12 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
11 11 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 02/27 3:02 PM
Affidavit of Service regarding service of Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/27 10:36 AM
Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Order Signed on 2/27/2020. (JMW)
Related: [-] 9
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation
Friday, February 21, 2020
9 9 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Fri 02/21 8:29 PM
Certification of Counsel With Respect to Stipulation Further Extending the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order
Friday, December 27, 2019
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/27 2:36 PM
Certificate of Service for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 544, 547, 548, 549 and/or 550 [Main Docket No. 2673]. Filed by Trustees of the M&G Corporation Litigation Trust. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2019
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 12/16 11:47 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Trustees of the M&G Corporation Litigation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2019
6 6 8 pgs order Order Mon 12/09 12:19 PM
Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings. Signed on 12/9/2019 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
5 5 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Tue 12/03 9:23 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of the Trustees of the M & G Corporation Litigation Trust for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C §§ 544, 547, 548, 549 and/or 550 Related [+] Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-] 3
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - List of Avoidance Actions
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Revised Proposed Order
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Black Line Revised Proposed Order
Friday, November 08, 2019
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 11/08 9:03 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Panalytical Inc.. Related [+] (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
3 3 motion Approve - Motion Wed 11/06 2:21 PM
Motion to Approve (Motion of the Trustees of the M & G Corporation Litigation Trust for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C §§ 544, 547, 548, 549 and/or 550). Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/2/2019. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 10/21 10:51 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50690 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9494112, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2019
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 10/18 10:05 PM
Adversary case 19-50690 Complaint by Alan D. Halperin and Ankura Trust Company, as co-trustees of the M & G Corporation Litigation Trust against Panalytical Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 1/16/2020. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A