Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12307

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:19-ap-50696
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2019
Terminated:Mar 03, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Orr Safety Corp.
Represented By
Orr Safety Corp.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan D. Halperin
Represented By
Scott A. Ziluck
Halperin Battaglia Benjiza, LLP
contact info
J. Kate Stickles
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ankura Trust Company, as co-trustee of the M & G Corporation Litigation Trust
Represented By
Ankura Trust Company
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
9 9 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 03/03 9:31 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/03 1:40 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50696 Closed (SJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2019
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/27 2:36 PM
Certificate of Service for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 544, 547, 548, 549 and/or 550 [Main Docket No. 2673]. Filed by Trustees of the M&G Corporation Litigation Trust. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2019
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 12/16 11:47 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Trustees of the M&G Corporation Litigation Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2019
6 6 8 pgs order Order Mon 12/09 12:19 PM
Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings. Signed on 12/9/2019 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2019
5 5 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Tue 12/03 9:30 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of the Trustees of the M & G Corporation Litigation Trust for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C §§ 544, 547, 548, 549 and/or 550 Related [+] Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-] 3
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - List of Avoidance Actions
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Revised Proposed Order
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Black Line Revised Proposed Order
Friday, November 08, 2019
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 11/08 8:59 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Orr Safety Corp.. Related [+] (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
3 3 motion Approve - Motion Wed 11/06 2:21 PM
Motion to Approve (Motion of the Trustees of the M & G Corporation Litigation Trust for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C §§ 544, 547, 548, 549 and/or 550). Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/2/2019. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 10/21 10:59 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50696 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9494180, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Mon 10/21 10:55 AM
Adversary case 19-50696 Complaint by Alan D. Halperin and Ankura Trust Company, as co-trustees of the M & G Corporation Litigation Trust against Orr Safety Corp.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 1/21/2020. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A