County of Somerset, Maryland v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45911 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Maryland, 1:19-cv-02763 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 8:34 PM EST |
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
8741 Landmark Road
Richmond, VA 23228 |
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Company
50 West Broad Street
Columbus, OH 43215 |
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health
|
|
Defendant
AbbVie Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Abbott Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 200, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health 414, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Covidien PLC
|
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 100
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
County of Somerset, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/29/2019 12:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 18, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
Case Reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Judge Theodore D. Chuang no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 10/24/2019.] | ||
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by County of Somerset, Maryland was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to 1 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 10/24/2019.] | |
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |