Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12307

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:19-ap-50711
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2019
Terminated:Jan 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Universidad De Zaragoza
Represented By
Universidad De Zaragoza
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan D. Halperin, as co-trustee of the M&G Litigation Trust
Represented By
Scott A. Ziluck
Halperin Battaglia Benjiza, LLP
contact info
J. Kate Stickles
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ankura Trust Company, as co-trustee of the M&G Litigation Trust
Represented By
Scott A. Ziluck
Halperin Battaglia Benjiza, LLP
contact info
J. Kate Stickles
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/24 10:03 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50711 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/12 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
11 11 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Tue 01/09 11:04 AM
Default Judgment Against Defendant Universidad De Zaragoza. Related [+] Signed on 1/9/2024. (LCN)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, January 08, 2024
10 10 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Mon 01/08 10:36 AM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin.
Related: [-] 8 8 illey, Patrick
Att: 1 Judgment By Default
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, December 14, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/15 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
8 8 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 12/12 9:38 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Universidad De Zaragoza Related [+] Signed on 12/12/2023. (LCN)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, December 08, 2023
7 7 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Fri 12/08 4:15 PM
Request for Entry of Default (Plaintiffs' Request for Entry of Default). Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
Att: 1 Entry of Default
Att: 2 Declaration of Counsel in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Entry of Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
6 6 misc Status Report Wed 08/10 10:56 AM
Status Report Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
Friday, January 15, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/15 2:41 PM
Certificate of Service regarding service of Complaint, Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference, Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives and Hague Convention Notice. Related [+] Filed by Ankura Trust Company, Alan D. Halperin. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Monday, December 09, 2019
4 4 8 pgs order Order Mon 12/09 12:21 PM
Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings. Signed on 12/9/2019 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/20 9:55 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Universidad De Zaragoza. Related [+] (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 10/23 4:49 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50711 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9499723, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 10/23 3:16 PM
Adversary case 19-50711 Complaint by Halperin, Alan D., Ankura Trust Company against Universidad De Zaragoza. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 1/21/2020. (Stickles, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A