Raymond v. Monsanto Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-06735 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 21, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Florida Middle, 8:19-cv-02032 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 18, 2020 1:48 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Raymond
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago |
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) |
|
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
utility
MDL Member Case
Fri 10/25 8:00 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Middle District of Florida, 19-02032 Raymond, Patricia, opened in California Northern District as 19-06735 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 156 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, October 24, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:19-cv-02032. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, October 09, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-2032-T-36SPF. (SJB) | |
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |