WhatsApp Inc. et al v. NSO Group Technologies Limited et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Phyllis J Hamilton |
Referred: | Kandis A Westmore |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-07123 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Oct 29, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, 20-16408 Supreme Court of the United States, 21-01338 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 26, 2020 2:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
NSO Group Technologies Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Q Cyber Technologies Limited
|
Represented By
|
Miscellaneous
King & Spalding LLP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Facebook Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WhatsApp Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal court rules WhatsApp and Facebook's malware exploit case against NSO Group can proceed. (social.techcrunch.com) |
Submitted Fri 07/17/2020 | |
2. | Facebook Sues Israel's NSO Group Over Alleged WhatsApp Attack (wsj.com) |
Submitted Wed 10/30/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
334 | 334
![]() |
|
333 | 333
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
332 | 332
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
331 | 331
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
330 | 330
![]() |
|
329 | 329
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
328 | 328
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
327 | 327
![]() |
|
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
326 | 326
![]() |