USA v. Martin
Connecticut District Court | |
Case #: | 3:19-mj-01438 |
Case Filed: | Oct 02, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 01, 2019 3:26 AM EDT |
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Malique Martin (1)
Terminated: 10/23/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/01/2019 4:01 AM EDT |
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
Attorney update in case as to Malique Martin. Attorney James P. Maguire for Malique Martin added. (Barry, Donna) | ||
Set Deadlines as to Malique Martin: Unseal Deadline - 10/23/2019 (Barry, Donna) | ||
Arrest of Malique Martin (Campbell, A) | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5 Oral MOTION to Continue Case under Seal by USA as to Malique Martin. (Barry, Donna) | |
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12 ORDER OF TRANSFER in case as to Malique Martin Case reassigned to Judge Robert M. Spector for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 10/2/2019. (Caffrey, A.) |