Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:19-cv-07105
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2019
Case in other court:Iowa Southern, 3:19-cv-00072
Last checked: Sunday Apr 26, 2020 2:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company, Inc.
Represented By
Joe G. Hollingsworth
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ron F. Skoronski
Represented By
A. John Arenz
O'Connor & Thomas, P.C.
contact info
Davin C. Curtiss
O'Connor & Thomas, P.C.
contact info
Christopher C. Fry
O'Connor & Thomas, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Thursday, April 14, 2022
13 13 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Thu 04/14 12:34 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Ron F. Skoronski. (Fry, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
12 12 1 pgs order Order Tue 06/30 5:42 PM
ORDER WITHDRAWING APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/30/2020. (knm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/11 1:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company, Inc.. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 12/11 1:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company, Inc.. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 12/11 1:13 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company, Inc.. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2019
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 10/31 1:02 PM
Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00072. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Thu 10/31 4:43 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Southern District of Iowa, 19-00072 Skoronski, opened in California Northern District as 19-07105 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 158 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
7 7 Certified Conditional Transfer Order by clerk's office by the Northern District of California. (kjw)
Related: [-]
***Civil Case Terminated. Case electronically sent to the Northern District of California. (kjw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
6 6 Certified Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2741 by Northern District of California. (kjw)
Related: [-]
5 5 TEXT MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-158) Finalized on 10/16/19. Please see pleading (3 in CO/1:19-cv-02339, 3 in CO/1:19-cv-02689, 3 in FLM/2:19-cv-00608, 3 in FLM/2:19-cv-00721, 3 in FLM/3:19-cv-00976, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02034, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02035, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02037, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02072, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02075, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02083, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02086, 3 in FLM/8:19-cv-02261, 3 in FLS/1:19-cv-23715, 3 in FLS/4:19-cv-10155, 3 in GAN/4:19-cv-00194, 3 in IAN/6:19-cv-02061, 3 in IAS/3:19-cv-00072, 3 in ILN/1:19-cv-06313, 3 in LAW/6:19-cv-01276, 1336 in MDL No. 2741, 3 in MN/0:19-cv-02625, 3 in MN/0:19-cv-02628, 3 in MOE/4:19-cv-02421, 3 in MOE/4:19-cv-02426, 3 in MOE/4:19-cv-02430, 3 in MOE/4:19-cv-02432, 3 in MOE/4:19-cv-02435, 3 in MOE/4:19-cv-02610, 3 in NYS/7:19-cv-08776, 3 in OHN/3:19-cv-01833, 3 in PAW/2:19-cv-01234, 3 in SC/7:19-cv-02581, 3 in SC/8:19-cv-02605). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 10/16/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2741 et al. (CMD) (kjw)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Fry on behalf of Ron F. Skoronski (Fry, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2019
3 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (kjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7.1 packet
2 2 Letter to MDL Panel regarding Potential Tag-Along Action. Emailed Docket sheet, complaint and letter to the MDL Panel. (kjw)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Monsanto Company, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3941265., filed by Ron F Skoronski. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/2/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/2/2020.(Curtiss, Davin)
Related: [-]